EP2017831 - Method and apparatus for transmitting and processing audio [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.08.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.09.2014 [2014/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | [2012/38] |
Former [2009/04] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 442-742 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Seung-hoon 54-379 Jongam-dong Seongbuk-gu Seoul / KR | [2009/04] | Representative(s) | Bray, Richard Anthony Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [2013/42] |
Former [2009/04] | Clark, David James Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | Application number, filing date | 08150559.6 | 23.01.2008 | [2009/04] | Priority number, date | KR20070073119 | 20.07.2007 Original published format: KR 20070073119 | [2009/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2017831 | Date: | 21.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2017831 | Date: | 28.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G10L19/04 | [2013/36] | CPC: |
G10L19/167 (EP,US);
H04L25/02 (KR);
H04M11/06 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2009/04] | G10L19/14 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2014/19] |
Former [2009/04] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Übertragung und Verarbeitung von Audio | [2009/04] | English: | Method and apparatus for transmitting and processing audio | [2009/04] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour une transmission et un traitement audio | [2009/04] | Examination procedure | 01.03.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/36] | 14.04.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2014 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2003161347 (METCHALF THOMAS D [US]) [X] 1-23 * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0066] * * paragraph [0076] * * paragraph [0114] - paragraph [0115] * * paragraph [0128] ** figure 2 * |