EP1956198 - Rocker arm with a lever body formed from folded metal sheet [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.03.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.04.2011 [2011/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schaeffler KG Industriestrasse 1-3 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | [2010/19] |
Former [2010/19] | For all designated states Schaeffler KG Industriestrasse 1-3 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | ||
Former [2008/33] | For all designated states Schaeffler KG Industriestrasse 1-3 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nguyen, Van Hau Hardstrasse 9 90766 Fürth / DE | [2008/33] | Application number, filing date | 08150587.7 | 24.01.2008 | [2008/33] | Priority number, date | DE20071006695 | 10.02.2007 Original published format: DE102007006695 | [2008/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1956198 | Date: | 13.08.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1956198 | Date: | 12.05.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F01L1/18, B21K3/00 | [2008/33] | CPC: |
F01L1/185 (EP);
F01L2001/187 (EP);
F01L2303/00 (EP);
F01L2305/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT, PL [2009/17] |
Former [2008/33] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Schlepphebel mit einem aus Blechwerkstoff umgeformten Hebelkörper | [2008/33] | English: | Rocker arm with a lever body formed from folded metal sheet | [2008/33] | French: | Culbuteur doté d'un corps profilé en tôle | [2008/33] | Examination procedure | 13.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/13] | 14.02.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 11.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.03.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 14.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 24.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.02.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE19543657 (SCHAEFFLER WAELZLAGER KG [DE]) [X] 1-3 * column 3, lines 45-49; figures 3,10-13 * [Y] 4; | [Y]DE19717991 (SCHAEFFLER WAELZLAGER OHG [DE]) [Y] 4 * column 3, line 68 - column 4, line 8; figures 15,16; claim 11 *; | [A]US6062184 (ENGELHARDT HELMUT [DE], et al) [A] 1 * figures 3,10-13 *; | [A]DE19750206 (SCHAEFFLER WAELZLAGER OHG [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]DE19617668 (SCHAEFFLER WAELZLAGER KG [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]DE19652676 (SCHAEFFLER WAELZLAGER OHG [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE19543657 | DE19717991 | DE19811658 |