EP1959061 - Accessory for the bowl of a lavatory, particularly for a water closet [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.08.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Didonè, Gino Piazza Europa Unita, 60 31033 Castelfranco Veneto (TV) / IT | [2008/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2008/34] | Representative(s) | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi, et al GLP S.r.l. Viale Europa Unita, 171 33100 Udine / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi, et al GLP S.r.l. Piazzale Cavedalis 6/2 33100 Udine / IT | Application number, filing date | 08151338.4 | 13.02.2008 | [2008/34] | Priority number, date | IT2007UD00031 | 14.02.2007 Original published format: IT UD20070031 | [2008/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1959061 | Date: | 20.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1959061 | Date: | 08.04.2009 | [2009/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1959061 | Date: | 26.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | E03D9/08 | [2008/34] | CPC: |
E03D9/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/34] | Title | German: | Zubehör für die Schüssel einer Toilette, insbesondere für ein Wasserklosett | [2008/34] | English: | Accessory for the bowl of a lavatory, particularly for a water closet | [2008/34] | French: | Accessoire pour cuvette de toilettes, en particulier pour wc | [2008/34] | Examination procedure | 14.07.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/35] | 28.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.07.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 29.07.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.09.2010 | Opposition(s) | 27.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.02.2008 | AT | 26.10.2011 | BE | 26.10.2011 | CY | 26.10.2011 | CZ | 26.10.2011 | DK | 26.10.2011 | EE | 26.10.2011 | FI | 26.10.2011 | HR | 26.10.2011 | LT | 26.10.2011 | LV | 26.10.2011 | MT | 26.10.2011 | NL | 26.10.2011 | PL | 26.10.2011 | RO | 26.10.2011 | SE | 26.10.2011 | SI | 26.10.2011 | SK | 26.10.2011 | TR | 26.10.2011 | BG | 26.01.2012 | NO | 26.01.2012 | GR | 27.01.2012 | ES | 06.02.2012 | GB | 13.02.2012 | IE | 13.02.2012 | LU | 13.02.2012 | IS | 26.02.2012 | PT | 27.02.2012 | CH | 29.02.2012 | FR | 29.02.2012 | LI | 29.02.2012 | MC | 29.02.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 26.10.2011 | |
BE | 26.10.2011 | ||
CY | 26.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
DK | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
FI | 26.10.2011 | ||
HR | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
MT | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
RO | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
SK | 26.10.2011 | ||
TR | 26.10.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
ES | 06.02.2012 | ||
GB | 13.02.2012 | ||
IE | 13.02.2012 | ||
LU | 13.02.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
FR | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 26.10.2011 | |
BE | 26.10.2011 | ||
CY | 26.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
DK | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
FI | 26.10.2011 | ||
HR | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
MT | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
RO | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
SK | 26.10.2011 | ||
TR | 26.10.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
ES | 06.02.2012 | ||
GB | 13.02.2012 | ||
IE | 13.02.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
FR | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 26.10.2011 | |
BE | 26.10.2011 | ||
CY | 26.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
DK | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
FI | 26.10.2011 | ||
HR | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
MT | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
RO | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
SK | 26.10.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
ES | 06.02.2012 | ||
GB | 13.02.2012 | ||
IE | 13.02.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
FR | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 26.10.2011 | |
BE | 26.10.2011 | ||
CY | 26.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
DK | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
FI | 26.10.2011 | ||
HR | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
RO | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
SK | 26.10.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
ES | 06.02.2012 | ||
GB | 13.02.2012 | ||
IE | 13.02.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
FR | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 26.10.2011 | |
BE | 26.10.2011 | ||
CY | 26.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
DK | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
HR | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
RO | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
SK | 26.10.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
ES | 06.02.2012 | ||
GB | 13.02.2012 | ||
IE | 13.02.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
FR | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 26.10.2011 | |
BE | 26.10.2011 | ||
CY | 26.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
DK | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
HR | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
RO | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
SK | 26.10.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
GB | 13.02.2012 | ||
IE | 13.02.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
FR | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 26.10.2011 | |
BE | 26.10.2011 | ||
CY | 26.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
DK | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
HR | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
RO | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
SK | 26.10.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IE | 13.02.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
FR | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 26.10.2011 | |
BE | 26.10.2011 | ||
CY | 26.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
DK | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
HR | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
RO | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
SK | 26.10.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
FR | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 26.10.2011 | |
CY | 26.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
DK | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
HR | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
RO | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
SK | 26.10.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/42] | BE | 26.10.2011 | |
CY | 26.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
DK | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
HR | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
RO | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
SK | 26.10.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 26.10.2011 | |
CY | 26.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
DK | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
HR | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
RO | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
SK | 26.10.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 26.10.2011 | |
CY | 26.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
DK | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
HR | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 26.10.2011 | |
CY | 26.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
HR | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | BE | 26.10.2011 | |
CY | 26.10.2011 | ||
HR | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/27] | BE | 26.10.2011 | |
HR | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/26] | BE | 26.10.2011 | |
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | BE | 26.10.2011 | |
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | BE | 26.10.2011 | |
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | BE | 26.10.2011 | |
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 26.10.2011 | |
NO | 26.01.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2186039 (SCHWECKE HUYOT NTJE [US]) [Y] 8-10 * page 5, line 13 - page 7, line 11; figures 6-8 *; | [XY]FR2352116 (LUTZ RAINER [DE]) [X] 1-7 * page 5, line 38 - page 12, line 10; figure - * [Y] 8-10; | [A]DE19532821 (HAMMEDINGER ALBERT [DE]) [A] 1,10* figure - *; | [A]EP1288381 (INAX CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * figures 1-3 *; | [X]US2006162058 (MOSS STEVEN L [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0025]; figures 1-5 * | by applicant | FR2186039 | FR2352116 | EP1288381 | US2006162058 |