EP1975350 - Key for a locking cylinder and key with a locking cylinder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.11.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aug. Winkhaus GmbH & Co. KG August-Winkhaus-Strasse 31 48291 Telgte / DE | [2008/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kamm, Götz / Alte Salzstrasse 131 04209, Leipzig / DE | 02 /
Rasecke, Marc / Steegenbreede 32 49536, Lienen / DE | [2011/52] |
Former [2008/40] | 01 /
Kamm, Götz Alte Salzstrasse 131 04209, Leipzig / DE | ||
02 /
Rasecke, Marc Steegenbreede 32 49536, Lienen / DE | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2011/52] | Application number, filing date | 08151931.6 | 26.02.2008 | [2008/40] | Priority number, date | DE20071000176 | 27.03.2007 Original published format: DE102007000176 | [2008/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1975350 | Date: | 01.10.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1975350 | Date: | 28.12.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | E05B19/00 | [2008/40] | CPC: |
E05B19/0017 (EP);
E05B17/0062 (EP);
E05B19/0047 (EP);
E05B19/04 (EP);
E05B27/0064 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/40] | Title | German: | Schlüssel für einen Schliesszylinder und Schlüssel mit einem Schliesszylinder | [2008/40] | English: | Key for a locking cylinder and key with a locking cylinder | [2008/40] | French: | Clé pour un cylindre de serrage et clé dotée d'un cylindre de serrage | [2008/40] | Examination procedure | 05.03.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/16] | 08.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.03.2010 | Opposition(s) | 01.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.02.2008 | CY | 28.12.2011 | DK | 28.12.2011 | EE | 28.12.2011 | FI | 28.12.2011 | IE | 28.12.2011 | LT | 28.12.2011 | LV | 28.12.2011 | MT | 28.12.2011 | SE | 28.12.2011 | TR | 28.12.2011 | LU | 26.02.2012 | MC | 29.02.2012 | NO | 28.03.2012 | IS | 28.04.2012 | PT | 30.04.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
FI | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
MT | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
TR | 28.12.2011 | ||
LU | 26.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
NO | 28.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
FI | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
MT | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
TR | 28.12.2011 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
NO | 28.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
FI | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
MT | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
NO | 28.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
FI | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
NO | 28.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
NO | 28.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/42] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
NO | 28.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
NO | 28.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
NO | 28.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
NO | 28.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
NO | 28.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 28.12.2011 | |
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
NO | 28.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 28.12.2011 | |
NO | 28.03.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE680416 (RICARDO ALBERTZ) [X] 1-4 * figures 5-7 * * figures 1,2,4,15 * [A] 10; | [A]US4325242 (TIETZ WERNER) [A] 1,10 * column 4, line 4 - column 6, line 8; figures 1-5 *; | [A]DE9416941U (BAB IKON GMBH SCHLIESTECHNIK [DE]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]EP0637663 (GRUNDMANN SCHLIESSTECHNIK [AT]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 39 - column 5, line 46; figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP1653027 (BKS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0067]; figures 1-14 * | by applicant | DE680416 | EP0129862 | DE4337201 |