EP1965238 - Imaging lens and imaging device including the imaging lens [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.01.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.02.2010 [2010/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Enplas Corporation 30-1, Namiki 2-chome Kawaguchi-shi Saitama-ken 332-0034 / JP | [2008/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Saito, Tomohiro Enplas Corporation c/o Enplas Corporation 30-1, Namiki 2-chome Kawaguchi-shi Saitama 332-0034 / JP | [2008/36] | Representative(s) | McIlroy, Steven David Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/36] | McIlroy, Steven David Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 08151966.2 | 26.02.2008 | [2008/36] | Priority number, date | JP20070047094 | 27.02.2007 Original published format: JP 2007047094 | [2008/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1965238 | Date: | 03.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G02B9/12, G02B13/02 | [2008/36] | CPC: |
G02B13/0035 (EP,US);
G02B13/18 (EP,US);
G02B13/22 (EP,US);
G02B9/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/36] | Title | German: | Abbildungslinse und Abbildungsvorrichtung damit | [2008/36] | English: | Imaging lens and imaging device including the imaging lens | [2008/36] | French: | Lentille d'imagerie et dispositif d'imagerie l'incluant | [2008/36] | Examination procedure | 23.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/15] | 27.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.08.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/05] | 14.09.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/05] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP1914580 (ENPLAS CORP [JP]) [E] 1-8 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0025] *; | [E]EP1914581 (ENPLAS CORP [JP]) [E] 1-8 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0025] * | by applicant | JP2005173298 | JP2005091513 | JP2003322792 | JP2004163786 |