EP1965594 - Method for processing short message and communication terminal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.12.2010 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2008/36] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chen, Keping Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang 518129, Shenzhen / CN | 02 /
Li, Hongxing Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang 518129, Shenzhen / CN | 03 /
Chen, Gaoqi Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang 518129, Shenzhen / CN | [2008/36] | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schlossschmidstrasse 5 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/36] | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Ridlerstrasse 55 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08152154.4 | 29.02.2008 | [2008/36] | Priority number, date | CN2007173423 | 01.03.2007 Original published format: CN200710073423 | WO2008CN70256 | 03.02.2008 Original published format: PCT/CN2008/070256 | [2008/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1965594 | Date: | 03.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1965594 | Date: | 17.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/14, H04W88/02, G06F17/27 | [2009/50] | CPC: |
H04W4/14 (EP,US);
G06F40/279 (EP);
G06F40/30 (US);
H04W88/02 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/36] | H04Q7/22, G06F17/27 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/36] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Verarbeitung einer Kurznachricht und Kommunikationsendgerät | [2008/36] | English: | Method for processing short message and communication terminal | [2008/36] | French: | Procédé pour le traitement de messages courts et terminal de communication | [2008/36] | Examination procedure | 05.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/36] | 23.03.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.12.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.01.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 05.01.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.11.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/04] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.02.2010 | BE | 17.02.2010 | CY | 17.02.2010 | CZ | 17.02.2010 | DK | 17.02.2010 | EE | 17.02.2010 | FI | 17.02.2010 | HR | 17.02.2010 | IT | 17.02.2010 | LT | 17.02.2010 | LV | 17.02.2010 | MT | 17.02.2010 | NL | 17.02.2010 | PL | 17.02.2010 | RO | 17.02.2010 | SE | 17.02.2010 | SI | 17.02.2010 | SK | 17.02.2010 | TR | 17.02.2010 | IE | 28.02.2010 | LU | 28.02.2010 | MC | 31.03.2010 | BG | 17.05.2010 | NO | 17.05.2010 | GR | 18.05.2010 | ES | 28.05.2010 | IS | 17.06.2010 | PT | 17.07.2010 | HU | 18.08.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | AT | 17.02.2010 | |
BE | 17.02.2010 | ||
CY | 17.02.2010 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2010 | ||
DK | 17.02.2010 | ||
EE | 17.02.2010 | ||
FI | 17.02.2010 | ||
HR | 17.02.2010 | ||
IT | 17.02.2010 | ||
LT | 17.02.2010 | ||
LV | 17.02.2010 | ||
MT | 17.02.2010 | ||
NL | 17.02.2010 | ||
PL | 17.02.2010 | ||
RO | 17.02.2010 | ||
SE | 17.02.2010 | ||
SI | 17.02.2010 | ||
SK | 17.02.2010 | ||
IE | 28.02.2010 | ||
LU | 28.02.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
BG | 17.05.2010 | ||
NO | 17.05.2010 | ||
GR | 18.05.2010 | ||
ES | 28.05.2010 | ||
IS | 17.06.2010 | ||
PT | 17.07.2010 | ||
HU | 18.08.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 17.02.2010 | |
BE | 17.02.2010 | ||
CY | 17.02.2010 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2010 | ||
DK | 17.02.2010 | ||
EE | 17.02.2010 | ||
FI | 17.02.2010 | ||
HR | 17.02.2010 | ||
IT | 17.02.2010 | ||
LT | 17.02.2010 | ||
LV | 17.02.2010 | ||
MT | 17.02.2010 | ||
NL | 17.02.2010 | ||
PL | 17.02.2010 | ||
RO | 17.02.2010 | ||
SE | 17.02.2010 | ||
SI | 17.02.2010 | ||
SK | 17.02.2010 | ||
IE | 28.02.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
BG | 17.05.2010 | ||
NO | 17.05.2010 | ||
GR | 18.05.2010 | ||
ES | 28.05.2010 | ||
IS | 17.06.2010 | ||
PT | 17.07.2010 | ||
HU | 18.08.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | AT | 17.02.2010 | |
BE | 17.02.2010 | ||
CY | 17.02.2010 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2010 | ||
DK | 17.02.2010 | ||
EE | 17.02.2010 | ||
FI | 17.02.2010 | ||
HR | 17.02.2010 | ||
IT | 17.02.2010 | ||
LT | 17.02.2010 | ||
LV | 17.02.2010 | ||
MT | 17.02.2010 | ||
NL | 17.02.2010 | ||
PL | 17.02.2010 | ||
RO | 17.02.2010 | ||
SE | 17.02.2010 | ||
SI | 17.02.2010 | ||
SK | 17.02.2010 | ||
IE | 28.02.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
BG | 17.05.2010 | ||
NO | 17.05.2010 | ||
GR | 18.05.2010 | ||
ES | 28.05.2010 | ||
IS | 17.06.2010 | ||
PT | 17.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/25] | AT | 17.02.2010 | |
BE | 17.02.2010 | ||
CY | 17.02.2010 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2010 | ||
DK | 17.02.2010 | ||
EE | 17.02.2010 | ||
FI | 17.02.2010 | ||
HR | 17.02.2010 | ||
IT | 17.02.2010 | ||
LT | 17.02.2010 | ||
LV | 17.02.2010 | ||
MT | 17.02.2010 | ||
NL | 17.02.2010 | ||
PL | 17.02.2010 | ||
RO | 17.02.2010 | ||
SE | 17.02.2010 | ||
SI | 17.02.2010 | ||
SK | 17.02.2010 | ||
IE | 28.02.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
BG | 17.05.2010 | ||
NO | 17.05.2010 | ||
GR | 18.05.2010 | ||
ES | 28.05.2010 | ||
IS | 17.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | AT | 17.02.2010 | |
FI | 17.02.2010 | ||
HR | 17.02.2010 | ||
LT | 17.02.2010 | ||
LV | 17.02.2010 | ||
NL | 17.02.2010 | ||
PL | 17.02.2010 | ||
SI | 17.02.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
NO | 17.05.2010 | ||
ES | 28.05.2010 | ||
IS | 17.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/44] | AT | 17.02.2010 | |
FI | 17.02.2010 | ||
HR | 17.02.2010 | ||
LT | 17.02.2010 | ||
LV | 17.02.2010 | ||
PL | 17.02.2010 | ||
SI | 17.02.2010 | ||
NO | 17.05.2010 | ||
ES | 28.05.2010 | ||
IS | 17.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/33] | ES | 28.05.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2002024188 (NEC MOBILING LTD) [X] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0013] * * claim 1 *; | [X]KR20040079160 (LG ELECTRONICS INC) [X] 1-13 * abstract *; | [X]US2004203946 (WU VINCENT [TW], et al) [X] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0015] * * claims 5-7 *; | [A]GB2412191 (ISSUEBITS LTD [GB]) [A] 1-13 * abstract ** page 3, line 1 - page 5, line 15 *; | [A]EP1717668 (RESEARCH IN MOTION LTD [CA]) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0021] * | by applicant | KR20040079160 | US2004203946 |