EP1987729 - Bathrobe made of microfiber fabric and structure thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.09.2009 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.10.2009 [2009/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Anversa S.p.a. Via Aldo Moro 9/11 46016 Cogozzo di Viadana (MN) / IT | [2008/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Anversa, Luciano c/o ANVERSA S.P.A. Via Aldo Moro 9/11 46016 Cogozzo di Viadana (MN) / IT | [2008/45] | Representative(s) | Leone, Mario, et al Ing. Dallaglio S.r.l. Via Mazzini 2 43121 Parma / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/45] | Leone, Mario, et al Ing. Dallaglio Srl Viale Mentana 92/C 43100 Parma / IT | Application number, filing date | 08152193.2 | 03.03.2008 | [2008/45] | Priority number, date | IT2007PR00002U | 12.03.2007 Original published format: IT PR20070002 U | [2008/45] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1987729 | Date: | 05.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A41D7/00 | [2008/45] | CPC: |
A41D7/008 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2009/28] |
Former [2008/45] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Bademantel aus Mikrofaser-Stoff und Struktur davon | [2008/45] | English: | Bathrobe made of microfiber fabric and structure thereof | [2008/45] | French: | Peignoir en tissu à microfibres et sa structure | [2008/45] | Examination procedure | 06.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/44] | 12.06.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2009/44] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1312706 (SILVERSTAR CORP [KR]) [X] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [X]KR100409380B (NEWCLEAN CO LTD) [X] 1,5 * abstract *; | [X]JPH0797741 (KANEBO LTD) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [DA]US6367082 (MINA EMILIO [IT]) | by applicant | US6367082 |