EP2099047 - Combustion contact device and output switch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.08.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB Research Ltd Affolternstrasse 44 8050 Zürich / CH | [2009/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Franck, Christian Am Suteracher 4 8048 Zürich / CH | 02 /
Kriegel, Martin Mooshalde 10 5424 Unterehrendingen / CH | 03 /
Hunger, Olaf Durachweg 16 8200 Schaffhausen / CH | [2009/37] | Representative(s) | ABB Patent Attorneys C/o ABB Schweiz AG Intellectual Property CH-IP Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2012/40] | ABB Patent Attorneys C/o ABB Schweiz AG Intellectual Property CH-IP Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | ||
Former [2009/37] | ABB Patent Attorneys C/o ABB Schweiz AG Intellectual Property (CH-LC/IP), Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | Application number, filing date | 08152197.3 | 03.03.2008 | [2009/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2099047 | Date: | 09.09.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2099047 | Date: | 03.10.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01H33/91 | [2009/37] | CPC: |
H01H33/91 (EP);
H01H2033/907 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/37] | Title | German: | Abbrandkontaktanordnung und Leistungsschalter | [2012/23] | English: | Combustion contact device and output switch | [2009/37] | French: | Agencement de contact d'usure et disjoncteur | [2009/37] |
Former [2009/37] | Abbrandkontaktanordnung und Leisstungsschalter | Examination procedure | 24.02.2010 | Examination requested [2010/14] | 18.05.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.08.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 22.08.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.05.2012 | Opposition(s) | 04.07.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.03.2008 | CY | 03.10.2012 | CZ | 03.10.2012 | DK | 03.10.2012 | EE | 03.10.2012 | FI | 03.10.2012 | HR | 03.10.2012 | IT | 03.10.2012 | LT | 03.10.2012 | LV | 03.10.2012 | MT | 03.10.2012 | NL | 03.10.2012 | PL | 03.10.2012 | RO | 03.10.2012 | SE | 03.10.2012 | SI | 03.10.2012 | SK | 03.10.2012 | TR | 03.10.2012 | BG | 03.01.2013 | NO | 03.01.2013 | GR | 04.01.2013 | ES | 14.01.2013 | IS | 03.02.2013 | PT | 04.02.2013 | AT | 03.03.2013 | GB | 03.03.2013 | IE | 03.03.2013 | LU | 03.03.2013 | BE | 31.03.2013 | CH | 31.03.2013 | LI | 31.03.2013 | MC | 31.03.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 03.10.2012 | |
CZ | 03.10.2012 | ||
DK | 03.10.2012 | ||
EE | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
IT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
MT | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
RO | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
SK | 03.10.2012 | ||
TR | 03.10.2012 | ||
BG | 03.01.2013 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
AT | 03.03.2013 | ||
GB | 03.03.2013 | ||
IE | 03.03.2013 | ||
BE | 31.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.03.2013 | ||
LI | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 03.10.2012 | |
CZ | 03.10.2012 | ||
DK | 03.10.2012 | ||
EE | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
IT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
MT | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
RO | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
SK | 03.10.2012 | ||
BG | 03.01.2013 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
AT | 03.03.2013 | ||
GB | 03.03.2013 | ||
IE | 03.03.2013 | ||
BE | 31.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.03.2013 | ||
LI | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2014/32] | CY | 03.10.2012 | |
CZ | 03.10.2012 | ||
DK | 03.10.2012 | ||
EE | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
IT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
MT | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
RO | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
SK | 03.10.2012 | ||
BG | 03.01.2013 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
GB | 03.03.2013 | ||
IE | 03.03.2013 | ||
BE | 31.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.03.2013 | ||
LI | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | CY | 03.10.2012 | |
CZ | 03.10.2012 | ||
DK | 03.10.2012 | ||
EE | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
IT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
RO | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
SK | 03.10.2012 | ||
BG | 03.01.2013 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
GB | 03.03.2013 | ||
IE | 03.03.2013 | ||
BE | 31.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.03.2013 | ||
LI | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | CY | 03.10.2012 | |
CZ | 03.10.2012 | ||
DK | 03.10.2012 | ||
EE | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
IT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
RO | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
SK | 03.10.2012 | ||
BG | 03.01.2013 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
IE | 03.03.2013 | ||
BE | 31.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.03.2013 | ||
LI | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | CY | 03.10.2012 | |
CZ | 03.10.2012 | ||
DK | 03.10.2012 | ||
EE | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
IT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
RO | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
SK | 03.10.2012 | ||
BG | 03.01.2013 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
IE | 03.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | CY | 03.10.2012 | |
CZ | 03.10.2012 | ||
DK | 03.10.2012 | ||
EE | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
IT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
RO | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
SK | 03.10.2012 | ||
BG | 03.01.2013 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | CY | 03.10.2012 | |
CZ | 03.10.2012 | ||
DK | 03.10.2012 | ||
EE | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
IT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
RO | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
SK | 03.10.2012 | ||
BG | 03.01.2013 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CY | 03.10.2012 | |
CZ | 03.10.2012 | ||
DK | 03.10.2012 | ||
EE | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
SK | 03.10.2012 | ||
BG | 03.01.2013 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 03.10.2012 | |
DK | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
BG | 03.01.2013 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | CY | 03.10.2012 | |
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | CY | 03.10.2012 | |
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 03.10.2012 | |
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 03.10.2012 | |
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | LT | 03.10.2012 | |
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 03.10.2012 | |
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/11] | SI | 03.10.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0019806 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-19 * page 8, line 1 - page 10, line 27; figures 8-16 *; | [DA]US4939322 (KASHIMURA KATSUICHI [JP], et al) [DA] 1-19 * column 3, line 7 - column 52, line 41; figures 1-10 * | by applicant | EP1306868 | US4939322 |