EP1967709 - Exhaust gas treatment device and method of manufacturing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states J. Eberspächer GmbH & Co. KG Eberspächerstrasse 24 73730 Esslingen / DE | [2008/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wirth, Georg Eichendorffstr. 27 73230 Kirchheim/Teck / DE | [2008/37] | Representative(s) | BRP Renaud & Partner mbB Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Steuerberater Königstrasse 28 70173 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Bongen, Renaud & Partner Rechtsanwälte Notare Patentanwälte Königstrasse 28 70173 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2008/37] | Bongen, Renaud & Partner Rechtsanwälte Notare Patentanwälte Königstrasse 28 70173 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 08152247.6 | 04.03.2008 | [2008/37] | Priority number, date | DE20071011956 | 09.03.2007 Original published format: DE102007011956 | [2008/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1967709 | Date: | 10.09.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1967709 | Date: | 09.09.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F01N3/021, F01N3/28, F01N7/18 | [2008/37] | CPC: |
F01N3/0211 (EP,US);
F01N13/0097 (EP,US);
F01N13/1805 (EP,US);
F01N13/1838 (EP,US);
F01N13/1894 (EP,US);
F01N3/2853 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/37] | Title | German: | Abgasbehandlungseinrichtung und zugehöriges Herstellungsverfahren | [2008/37] | English: | Exhaust gas treatment device and method of manufacturing | [2008/37] | French: | Dispositif de traitement des gaz d'échappement et son procédé de fabrication | [2008/37] | Examination procedure | 10.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/17] | 05.05.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.07.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 29.07.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.06.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/33] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 09.09.2009 | CY | 09.09.2009 | CZ | 09.09.2009 | DK | 09.09.2009 | EE | 09.09.2009 | FI | 09.09.2009 | HR | 09.09.2009 | IE | 09.09.2009 | IT | 09.09.2009 | LT | 09.09.2009 | LV | 09.09.2009 | MT | 09.09.2009 | NL | 09.09.2009 | PL | 09.09.2009 | RO | 09.09.2009 | SI | 09.09.2009 | SK | 09.09.2009 | TR | 09.09.2009 | NO | 09.12.2009 | GR | 10.12.2009 | ES | 20.12.2009 | IS | 09.01.2010 | PT | 09.02.2010 | LU | 04.03.2010 | HU | 10.03.2010 | BE | 31.03.2010 | MC | 31.03.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | BG | 09.09.2009 | |
CY | 09.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2009 | ||
DK | 09.09.2009 | ||
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
HR | 09.09.2009 | ||
IE | 09.09.2009 | ||
IT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
MT | 09.09.2009 | ||
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
PL | 09.09.2009 | ||
RO | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
SK | 09.09.2009 | ||
NO | 09.12.2009 | ||
GR | 10.12.2009 | ||
ES | 20.12.2009 | ||
IS | 09.01.2010 | ||
PT | 09.02.2010 | ||
LU | 04.03.2010 | ||
HU | 10.03.2010 | ||
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | BG | 09.09.2009 | |
CY | 09.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2009 | ||
DK | 09.09.2009 | ||
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
HR | 09.09.2009 | ||
IE | 09.09.2009 | ||
IT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
MT | 09.09.2009 | ||
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
PL | 09.09.2009 | ||
RO | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
SK | 09.09.2009 | ||
NO | 09.12.2009 | ||
GR | 10.12.2009 | ||
ES | 20.12.2009 | ||
IS | 09.01.2010 | ||
PT | 09.02.2010 | ||
HU | 10.03.2010 | ||
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BG | 09.09.2009 | |
CY | 09.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2009 | ||
DK | 09.09.2009 | ||
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
HR | 09.09.2009 | ||
IE | 09.09.2009 | ||
IT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
MT | 09.09.2009 | ||
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
PL | 09.09.2009 | ||
RO | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
SK | 09.09.2009 | ||
NO | 09.12.2009 | ||
GR | 10.12.2009 | ||
ES | 20.12.2009 | ||
IS | 09.01.2010 | ||
PT | 09.02.2010 | ||
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/25] | CY | 09.09.2009 | |
CZ | 09.09.2009 | ||
DK | 09.09.2009 | ||
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
HR | 09.09.2009 | ||
IE | 09.09.2009 | ||
IT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
MT | 09.09.2009 | ||
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
PL | 09.09.2009 | ||
RO | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
SK | 09.09.2009 | ||
NO | 09.12.2009 | ||
GR | 10.12.2009 | ||
ES | 20.12.2009 | ||
IS | 09.01.2010 | ||
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/44] | CY | 09.09.2009 | |
CZ | 09.09.2009 | ||
DK | 09.09.2009 | ||
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
HR | 09.09.2009 | ||
IE | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
PL | 09.09.2009 | ||
RO | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
SK | 09.09.2009 | ||
NO | 09.12.2009 | ||
ES | 20.12.2009 | ||
IS | 09.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/28] | CY | 09.09.2009 | |
CZ | 09.09.2009 | ||
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
HR | 09.09.2009 | ||
IE | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
PL | 09.09.2009 | ||
RO | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
SK | 09.09.2009 | ||
NO | 09.12.2009 | ||
ES | 20.12.2009 | ||
IS | 09.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/19] | CY | 09.09.2009 | |
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
HR | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
PL | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
NO | 09.12.2009 | ||
ES | 20.12.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4050245 (LITTLE HAROLD A, et al) [A] 1* column 3, line 1 - column 3, line 16; figure 6 *; | [A]EP0236817 (FEV MOTORENTECH GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [DA]EP1498586 (ROTH TECHNIK AUSTRIA [AT]) [DA] 1 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]DE102005002857 (EBERSPAECHER J GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | EP1498586 |