EP1967946 - Method of converting a hybrid hard disk drive to a normal HDD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.01.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.02.2018 [2018/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | [2012/39] |
Former [2008/37] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-Dong, Yeongtong-Gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-Do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nam, Hye-jeong 325-2701, Sibeomdanji Hanyang Apt., Seohyeon-dong Bundang-gu, Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Lee, Jae-sung 604-1602, Poonglim Apt., Yeongtong-dong, ton Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2008/37] | Representative(s) | Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | [2013/51] |
Former [2008/37] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08152429.0 | 07.03.2008 | [2008/37] | Priority number, date | KR20070023167 | 08.03.2007 Original published format: KR 20070023167 | [2008/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1967946 | Date: | 10.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1967946 | Date: | 03.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/06, G06F11/07 | [2013/14] | CPC: |
G06F3/0634 (EP,US);
G06F1/00 (KR);
G06F12/0866 (EP,US);
G06F15/16 (KR);
G06F17/00 (KR);
G06F3/06 (KR);
G06F3/0614 (EP,US);
G06F3/0632 (EP,US);
G06F3/0674 (EP,US);
G06F3/068 (EP,US);
G06F2212/217 (EP,US);
G06F2212/6012 (EP,US);
G06F2212/7204 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2008/37] | G06F3/06 | Designated contracting states | DE [2013/46] |
Former [2008/37] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Umwandlung eines hybriden Festplattenlaufwerks in ein normales Festplattenlaufwerk | [2008/37] | English: | Method of converting a hybrid hard disk drive to a normal HDD | [2008/37] | French: | Procédé de conversion d'un lecteur de disque dur hybride vers un HDD normal | [2008/37] | Examination procedure | 03.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.10.2013 | Examination requested [2013/46] | 04.10.2013 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 22.11.2013 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 13.04.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/08] | 29.09.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2018/08] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.04.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2005172074 (SINCLAIR ALAN W [GB]) [Y] 1-26 * paragraphs [0046] , [0047] , [0049] , [0054] - [0058]; figures 1B,2B *; | [Y]US6249838 (KON RONNIE B [US]) [Y] 1-26 * abstract * * column 7, line 22 - column 8, line 20; figure 3 * * column 10, lines 1-10 *; | [A]US2003002366 (MIZOGUCHI SHINICHI [JP], et al) [A] 2-4,17,20 * abstract * |