EP1971181 - Headphone [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.11.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.02.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.05.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.12.2020 [2020/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2008/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oosato, Yuusuke Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 02 /
Nageno, Koji Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2017/16] |
Former [2008/38] | 01 /
Oosato, Yuusuke Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | ||
02 /
Nageno, Koji Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | Representative(s) | Melzer, Wolfgang Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 33 06 09 80066 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Melzer, Wolfgang Mitscherlich & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 33 06 09 80066 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08152644.4 | 12.03.2008 | [2008/38] | Priority number, date | JP20070063989 | 13.03.2007 Original published format: JP 2007063989 | [2008/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1971181 | Date: | 17.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1971181 | Date: | 07.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04R1/10, // H04R5/033, H04R1/34 | [2016/36] | CPC: |
H04R1/1008 (EP,US);
H04R1/1016 (EP,US);
H04R1/105 (EP,US);
H04R1/1066 (EP,US);
H04R1/345 (EP,US);
H04R2460/17 (EP,US);
H04R5/0335 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2008/38] | H04R1/10, // H04R5/033 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2017/16] |
Former [2008/38] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kopfhörer | [2008/38] | English: | Headphone | [2008/38] | French: | Écouteur | [2008/38] | Examination procedure | 12.03.2008 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.03.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/16] | 03.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/51] | 29.07.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/51] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.05.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 26.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 24.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]JPH0520493U (MITSUO MIYATA) [X] 1,2,5,8 * abstract * * figures 1-3 * [Y] 10 [I] 3,4,6,7,9; | [A]US5333206 (KOSS MICHAEL J [US]) [A] 1-10 * abstract ** figures 1-3 *; | [A]JP2003179990 (AUDIO TECHNICA KK) [A] 7 * abstract *; | [Y]US6868164 (ITO TOMOHIRO [JP], et al) [Y] 10 * abstract * * figures 14,15 *; | [A]JP2006115060 (MAKITEKKU KK) [A] 3,4 * abstract * | Examination | US5781638 | by applicant | JPH0654391 | JP2007063989 |