Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2718503 | 17.09.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009IB50948 | 06.03.2009 | EP08164651 | 18.09.2008 | EP08152758 | 14.03.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2100950 | 15.04.2015 | B1 | EP2100950 | 16.09.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP08164651 | 18.09.2008 | EP08152758 | 14.03.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2470527 | 24.11.2010 | A | GB201015099D0 | 27.10.2010 | D0 | Priority number | Date | WO2009IB50948 | 06.03.2009 | EP08164651 | 18.09.2008 | EP08152758 | 14.03.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5551622B | 16.07.2014 | B2 | JP2011517710 | 16.06.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2009IB50948 | 06.03.2009 | EP08164651 | 18.09.2008 | EP08152758 | 14.03.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2010010092 | 30.09.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2009IB50948 | 06.03.2009 | EP08164651 | 18.09.2008 | EP08152758 | 14.03.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2100950T | 30.09.2015 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP08164651 | 18.09.2008 | EP08152758 | 14.03.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009233832 | 17.09.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP08164651 | 18.09.2008 | EP08152758 | 14.03.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2009112994 | 17.09.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP08164651 | 18.09.2008 | EP08152758 | 14.03.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2100948 | 16.09.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP08152758 | 14.03.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2542056T | 30.07.2015 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP08152758 | 14.03.2008 |