EP2100948 - Automatic dishwashing detergent composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.08.2010 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.09.2010 [2010/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/38] | For all designated states The Procter and Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Souter, Philip Frank The Nook The Green Longhorsley Morpeth Northumberland NE65 8UP / GB | [2009/38] | Representative(s) | Yorquez Ramirez, Maria Isabel Patent Department Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Whitley Road Longbenton Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9TS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/38] | Yorquez Ramirez, Maria Isabel Patent Department Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Whitley Road Longbenton Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9TS / GB | Application number, filing date | 08152758.2 | 14.03.2008 | [2009/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2100948 | Date: | 16.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C11D3/386, // C11D17/04 | [2009/38] | CPC: |
C11D3/386 (EP,GB,US);
C11D17/042 (GB);
C11D2111/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2010/20] |
Former [2009/38] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Waschmittelzusammensetzung für Spülmaschinen | [2009/38] | English: | Automatic dishwashing detergent composition | [2009/38] | French: | Composition détergente de lave-vaisselle automatique | [2009/38] | Examination procedure | 17.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/36] | 22.04.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2010/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [L]WO9102792 (HENKEL RESEARCH CORP [US]); | [X]WO9963040 (HENKEL KGAA [DE], et al); | [X]WO0242408 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]); | [X]DE102005062984 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]); | [A]WO2008010925 (DANISCO US INC GENENCOR DIV [US], et al); | by applicant | GB1466799 | US4246612 | US4765916 | US4810410 | US4972017 | US5114611 | US5227084 | WO9422800 | WO9426860 | WO9426859 | WO9501416 | WO9529982 | WO9906521 | WO0208380 | US6426229 | WO02102955 | WO2004111178 | US6939702 | WO2007145964 |