EP1980399 - Mechanism for transfix member with idle movement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.04.2012 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.04.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.05.2012 [2012/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square - 20A, 100 Clinton Avenue South Rochester New York 14644 / US | [2008/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pearce, David J. Law Hall Cottage, Law Hall Lane Bendish, Hertfordshire SG4 8JG / GB | 02 /
Walsh, Martin R. 31 Highview Gardens St. Albans, Hertfordshire AL4 9JX / GB | [2008/42] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/42] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08153067.7 | 20.03.2008 | [2008/42] | Priority number, date | US20070784954 | 10.04.2007 Original published format: US 784954 | [2008/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1980399 | Date: | 15.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1980399 | Date: | 22.07.2009 | [2009/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1980399 | Date: | 01.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/005 | [2008/42] | CPC: |
B41J2/0057 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2010/13] |
Former [2008/42] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Mechanismus für ein Durchbohrungsglied mit Leerlaufbewegung | [2008/42] | English: | Mechanism for transfix member with idle movement | [2008/42] | French: | Mécanisme pour élément de transfert doté d'un mouvement de course à vide | [2008/42] | Examination procedure | 30.09.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/09] | 23.01.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 02.03.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 10.11.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.11.2010 | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0599217 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [X] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US2006250467 (FOLKINS JEFFREY J [US]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US2003095170 (JOHNSON BRUCE G [US]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP0599217 | US2006250467 | US2003095170 |