EP1976134 - Radio circuit arrangement with improved decoupling [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.03.2019 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.04.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.04.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.03.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.12.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.04.2019 [2019/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Deutschland GmbH Am Campeon 10-12 85579 Neubiberg / DE | [2015/50] |
Former [2012/09] | For all designated states Intel Mobile Communications GmbH Am Campeon 10-12 85579 Neubiberg / DE | ||
Former [2008/40] | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG Am Campeon 1-12 85579 Neubiberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Adler, Bernd Waldschmidtstr. 26 85579, Neubiberg / DE | 02 /
Boos, Zdravko Scheibmeirstr. 16 81827, München / DE | [2018/19] |
Former [2008/40] | 01 /
Adler, Bernd Waldschmidtstr. 26 85579, Neubiberg / DE | ||
02 /
Boos, Zdravko Scheibmeirstr. 16 81827, München / DE | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | [2018/19] |
Former [2013/09] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | ||
Former [2008/44] | Sticht, Andreas Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/40] | Sticht, Andreas Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08153226.9 | 25.03.2008 | [2008/40] | Priority number, date | US20070731398 | 30.03.2007 Original published format: US 731398 | [2008/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1976134 | Date: | 01.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1976134 | Date: | 28.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1976134 | Date: | 09.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/52 | [2008/40] | CPC: |
H04B1/406 (EP,US);
H04B1/006 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2013/31] |
Former [2008/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Radio-Schaltungsanordnung mit verbesserter Entkopplung | [2008/40] | English: | Radio circuit arrangement with improved decoupling | [2008/40] | French: | Agencement de circuit radio avec découplage amélioré | [2008/40] | Examination procedure | 16.05.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.05.2013 | Examination requested [2013/26] | 29.05.2013 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 02.07.2013 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 31.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.03.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 07.03.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 07.03.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.04.2018 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 03.04.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.03.2017 | Opposition(s) | 12.02.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB2005113 (SIEMENS AG) [Y] 21,23 * figures 2,3 *; | [X]FR2696889 (SAGEM [FR]) [X] 1,11,13 * page 5, line 24 - line 36 * * figure 1 *; | [A]JPH11251956 (NEC CORP) [A] 14-38* abstract *; | [Y]EP1220456 (NOKIA CORP [FI]) [Y] 28,29,37,38 * figures 2,3 * * claim 1 *; | [XY]US6643522 (YOUNG SONG-LIN [US]) [X] 1,2,7,8,10,11 * column 6, line 14 - column 7, line 6 * * figure 5 * [Y] 3,5,14-19,21,23,26-29,37,38; | [A]WO2004008634 (SONY ERICSSON MOBILE COMM AB [SE], et al) [A] 22,24 * page 9, line 23 - line 27 * * figure 1 *; | [XYI]US2005042989 (HO CHIA-CHENG [TW]) [X] 30-33,35,36 * paragraphs [0004] , [0005] * * claim 1 * * figures 2A, 2B,3-5 * [Y] 14-19,21,23,26-29,37,38 [I] 22,24; | [Y]EP1521379 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 3,5 * paragraph [0021] * * figure 3 *; | [X]US2005245216 (BOOS ZDRAVKO [DE]) [X] 1,11 * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0040] * * figure 1 *; | [X]US2005255812 (NA KWEON [KR], et al) [X] 1,11-13 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0048] * * figures 1-6 *; | [X]US2006040620 (JUNG JAE-HO [KR], et al) [X] 1,11 * paragraphs [0016] , [0018] * * figure 3 *; | [X]EP1684438 (MA COM INC [US]) [X] 1,6,11 * figure 3 * |