EP1985229 - A system for draining cerebrospinal fluid from a brain or spinal fluid cavity [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.06.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.07.2015 [2015/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DPCOM AS Gaustadalléen 21 0349 Oslo / NO | [2008/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eide, Per Kristian Axel Huitfeldts vei 11 1170 Oslo / NO | [2008/44] | Representative(s) | Langfeldt, Jens Fredrik Conradi, et al Zacco Norway AS Haakon VII's gt. 2 P.O. Box 2003 Vika 0125 Oslo / NO | [2008/44] | Application number, filing date | 08153267.3 | 20.07.2005 | [2008/44] | Priority number, date | US20040895387 | 21.07.2004 Original published format: US 895387 | [2008/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1985229 | Date: | 29.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1985229 | Date: | 25.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/03, A61B5/021, A61M27/00 | [2014/26] | CPC: |
A61M27/006 (EP,US);
A61B5/021 (EP,US);
A61B5/02108 (EP,US);
A61B5/031 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/44] | A61B5/03, A61M27/00, // A61B5/021 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/44] | Title | German: | System für Drainage des Liquors aus einer Flüssigkeitshöhle des Gehirns- oder Rückenmarks | [2008/44] | English: | A system for draining cerebrospinal fluid from a brain or spinal fluid cavity | [2008/44] | French: | Système de drainage du fluide céphalo-rachidien d'une cavité cérébrale ou spinale | [2008/44] | Examination procedure | 26.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/44] | 06.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/28] | 02.02.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/28] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05761772.2 / EP1786318 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050761772) is 20.02.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2003032915 (SAUL TOM [US]) [X] 1,3-5,7-9,21,27 * paragraphs [0012] , [0024] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0036] * * claim 11 * * figures 1a-3b * [Y] 16,19,20,22 [I] 2,6,10-12,14,15,17,18,23-26; | [YA]US2003100845 (EIDE PER KRISTIAN [NO]) [Y] 16,19 * paragraph [0067] - paragraph [0117] * * paragraph [0132] - paragraph [0138] * * paragraph [0142] - paragraph [0146] * * paragraph [0152] - paragraph [0160] * * paragraph [0173] - paragraph [0178] * [A] 1-15,17,18,20-27; | [YA]US5795307 (KRUEGER JOHN A [US]) [Y] 22 * column 4, line 12 - line 40 * * column 5, line 12 - column 6, line 10 * * column 6, line 62 - column 7, line 40 * * figures 1,3,5-7 * [A] 1-21,23-27; | [YA]WO02062215 (MEDTRONIC INC [US]) [Y] 20 * page 6, line 10 - page 13, line 4 * * page 15, line 17 - page 17, line 18 * * page 30, line 21 - page 31, line 7 * [A] 1-19,21-27; | [A]US5637083 (BERTRAND WILLIAM J [US], et al) [A] 1-27 * column 7, line 66 - column 10, line 63 * * figures 1-14 *; | [A]US2004087863 (EIDE PER KRISTIAN [NO]) [A] 1-27 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0158] * * figures 1a-3b,5a-8c,12a-c *; | [A]US2003216666 (ERICSON MILTON N [US], et al) [A] 1-27 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0048] * * figure 1 * | by applicant | US2003100845 | US2004087863 | WO02087435 | WO2004039257 |