EP2106056 - Methods, apparatuses, system, and related computer program product for information transmission [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.09.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.10.2010 [2010/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Siemens Networks Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | [2009/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hooli, Kari Paloniementie 5C6 90540, Oulu / FI | 02 /
Tiirola, Esa Porttikellonkuja 12 90450, Kempele / FI | 03 /
KinnunenPasi Tallikuja 1B17 90240, Oulu / FI | 04 /
Pajukoski, Kari Purontie 3 90240, Oulu / FI | [2009/40] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/40] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08153305.1 | 26.03.2008 | [2009/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2106056 | Date: | 30.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/18, H04L1/08 | [2009/40] | CPC: |
H04L1/08 (EP,US);
H04L1/1812 (EP,US);
H04L1/189 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2010/22] |
Former [2009/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren, Vorrichtungen, System und entsprechendes Computerprogramm zur Informationsübertragung | [2009/40] | English: | Methods, apparatuses, system, and related computer program product for information transmission | [2009/40] | French: | Procédés, appareils, système et produit de programme informatique correspondant pour transmission d'informations | [2009/40] | Examination procedure | 31.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/40] | 11.05.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2010/40] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1791285 (ALCATEL LUCENT [FR]) [X] 1-32 * abstract * * paragraph [0018]; figure 2 *; | [X]WO0052873 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [X] 1-32 * page 14 - page 15; figure 5 *; | [X]US7145889 (ZHANG HANG [CA], et al) [X] 1-32 * column 7, line 59 - column 8, line 61 *; | [X]WO2008014388 (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al) [X] 1-32 * paragraph [0074] - paragraph [0075]; figure 6a * * paragraph [0041] *; | [X] - ERICSSON, "HARQ operation in case of UL Power Limitation Tdoc R2-074940", 3GPP TSG-RAN WG2, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/TSG_RAN/WG2_RL2/TSGR2_60/Docs/, XP002502474 [X] 1-32 * the whole document * |