EP2074899 - Method for manufacturing antistatic shoes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/27] | Method and mold for manufacturing antistatic shoes and molded antistatic shoe | ||
[2012/31] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.01.2014 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 29.06.2016 [2016/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thermoshoe di Baldin e C. S.n.c. Via Parenzo 2 35010 Vigonza (Padova) / IT | [2009/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baldin, Francesco Via S. Marco, 189/B/4 35010, Padova / IT | [2009/27] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano & Partners Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2013/09] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano & Partners (IT) Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2009/27] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Dr. Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli 16 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 08153386.1 | 27.03.2008 | [2009/27] | Priority number, date | IT2007VE00098 | 21.12.2007 Original published format: IT VE20070098 | [2009/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2074899 | Date: | 01.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2074899 | Date: | 27.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A43B3/10, A43B7/36, B29C65/66, B29D35/00, B29D35/04, B29C65/58, B29L31/50 | [2012/31] | CPC: |
B29D35/04 (EP);
A43B3/106 (EP);
A43B7/36 (EP);
B29C65/58 (EP);
B29C65/665 (EP);
B29C66/12449 (EP);
B29C66/12469 (EP);
B29C66/126 (EP);
B29C66/532 (EP);
B29C66/63 (EP);
B29C66/71 (EP);
B29D35/0027 (EP);
B29C45/7207 (EP);
B29C45/73 (EP);
B29C66/1122 (EP);
| C-Set: |
B29C66/71, B29K2023/083 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2009/27] | A43B3/10, A43B7/36, B29D31/50, B29D31/505 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/27] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung antistatischer Schuhe | [2012/31] | English: | Method for manufacturing antistatic shoes | [2012/31] | French: | Procédé pour la fabrication de chaussures antistatiques | [2012/31] |
Former [2009/27] | Verfahren und Giessform zur Herstellung antistatischer Schuhe und gegossener antistatischer Schuh | ||
Former [2009/27] | Method and mold for manufacturing antistatic shoes and molded antistatic shoe | ||
Former [2009/27] | Procédé et moule pour la fabrication de chaussures antistatiques et chaussure antistatique moulée | Examination procedure | 18.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/05] | 19.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.01.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 16.01.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.01.2010 | Opposition(s) | 28.11.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.03.2008 | AT | 27.02.2013 | BE | 27.02.2013 | CY | 27.02.2013 | CZ | 27.02.2013 | DK | 27.02.2013 | EE | 27.02.2013 | FI | 27.02.2013 | HR | 27.02.2013 | LT | 27.02.2013 | LV | 27.02.2013 | MT | 27.02.2013 | NL | 27.02.2013 | PL | 27.02.2013 | RO | 27.02.2013 | SE | 27.02.2013 | SI | 27.02.2013 | SK | 27.02.2013 | TR | 27.02.2013 | IE | 27.03.2013 | LU | 27.03.2013 | CH | 31.03.2013 | FR | 31.03.2013 | LI | 31.03.2013 | MC | 31.03.2013 | BG | 27.05.2013 | GB | 27.05.2013 | NO | 27.05.2013 | GR | 28.05.2013 | ES | 07.06.2013 | IS | 27.06.2013 | PT | 27.06.2013 | DE | 01.10.2013 | [2016/26] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 27.03.2008 | |
AT | 27.02.2013 | ||
BE | 27.02.2013 | ||
CY | 27.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2013 | ||
DK | 27.02.2013 | ||
EE | 27.02.2013 | ||
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
HR | 27.02.2013 | ||
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LV | 27.02.2013 | ||
MT | 27.02.2013 | ||
NL | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
RO | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
SK | 27.02.2013 | ||
TR | 27.02.2013 | ||
IE | 27.03.2013 | ||
LU | 27.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.03.2013 | ||
LI | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
GB | 27.05.2013 | ||
NO | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
ES | 07.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
PT | 27.06.2013 | ||
DE | 01.10.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 27.02.2013 | |
BE | 27.02.2013 | ||
CY | 27.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2013 | ||
DK | 27.02.2013 | ||
EE | 27.02.2013 | ||
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
HR | 27.02.2013 | ||
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LV | 27.02.2013 | ||
MT | 27.02.2013 | ||
NL | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
RO | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
SK | 27.02.2013 | ||
TR | 27.02.2013 | ||
IE | 27.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.03.2013 | ||
LI | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
GB | 27.05.2013 | ||
NO | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
ES | 07.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
PT | 27.06.2013 | ||
DE | 01.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/32] | AT | 27.02.2013 | |
BE | 27.02.2013 | ||
CY | 27.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2013 | ||
DK | 27.02.2013 | ||
EE | 27.02.2013 | ||
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
HR | 27.02.2013 | ||
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LV | 27.02.2013 | ||
MT | 27.02.2013 | ||
NL | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
RO | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
SK | 27.02.2013 | ||
IE | 27.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.03.2013 | ||
LI | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
GB | 27.05.2013 | ||
NO | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
ES | 07.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
PT | 27.06.2013 | ||
DE | 01.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 27.02.2013 | |
BE | 27.02.2013 | ||
CY | 27.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2013 | ||
DK | 27.02.2013 | ||
EE | 27.02.2013 | ||
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
HR | 27.02.2013 | ||
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LV | 27.02.2013 | ||
NL | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
RO | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
SK | 27.02.2013 | ||
IE | 27.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.03.2013 | ||
LI | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
GB | 27.05.2013 | ||
NO | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
ES | 07.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
PT | 27.06.2013 | ||
DE | 01.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 27.02.2013 | |
BE | 27.02.2013 | ||
CY | 27.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2013 | ||
DK | 27.02.2013 | ||
EE | 27.02.2013 | ||
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
HR | 27.02.2013 | ||
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LV | 27.02.2013 | ||
NL | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
RO | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
SK | 27.02.2013 | ||
IE | 27.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.03.2013 | ||
LI | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
NO | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
ES | 07.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
PT | 27.06.2013 | ||
DE | 01.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 27.02.2013 | |
BE | 27.02.2013 | ||
CY | 27.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2013 | ||
DK | 27.02.2013 | ||
EE | 27.02.2013 | ||
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
HR | 27.02.2013 | ||
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LV | 27.02.2013 | ||
NL | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
RO | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
SK | 27.02.2013 | ||
IE | 27.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.03.2013 | ||
LI | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
NO | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
ES | 07.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
PT | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | AT | 27.02.2013 | |
BE | 27.02.2013 | ||
CY | 27.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2013 | ||
DK | 27.02.2013 | ||
EE | 27.02.2013 | ||
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
HR | 27.02.2013 | ||
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LV | 27.02.2013 | ||
NL | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
RO | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
SK | 27.02.2013 | ||
IE | 27.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
NO | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
ES | 07.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
PT | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 27.02.2013 | |
BE | 27.02.2013 | ||
CY | 27.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2013 | ||
DK | 27.02.2013 | ||
EE | 27.02.2013 | ||
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
HR | 27.02.2013 | ||
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LV | 27.02.2013 | ||
NL | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
RO | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
SK | 27.02.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
NO | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
ES | 07.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
PT | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 27.02.2013 | |
BE | 27.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2013 | ||
DK | 27.02.2013 | ||
EE | 27.02.2013 | ||
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
HR | 27.02.2013 | ||
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LV | 27.02.2013 | ||
NL | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
RO | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
SK | 27.02.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
NO | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
ES | 07.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
PT | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 27.02.2013 | |
BE | 27.02.2013 | ||
DK | 27.02.2013 | ||
EE | 27.02.2013 | ||
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
HR | 27.02.2013 | ||
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LV | 27.02.2013 | ||
NL | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
NO | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
ES | 07.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
PT | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 27.02.2013 | |
BE | 27.02.2013 | ||
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
HR | 27.02.2013 | ||
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LV | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
NO | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
ES | 07.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
PT | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/41] | AT | 27.02.2013 | |
BE | 27.02.2013 | ||
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
HR | 27.02.2013 | ||
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LV | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
NO | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
ES | 07.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
PT | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 27.02.2013 | |
BE | 27.02.2013 | ||
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LV | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
NO | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
ES | 07.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
PT | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | AT | 27.02.2013 | |
BE | 27.02.2013 | ||
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LV | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
NO | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
ES | 07.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 27.02.2013 | |
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
NO | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
ES | 07.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 27.02.2013 | |
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
NO | 27.05.2013 | ||
ES | 07.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 27.02.2013 | |
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
NO | 27.05.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 27.02.2013 | |
NO | 27.05.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [AY]EP1186403 (SUOLIFICIO ROMAGNOLO SNC [IT], et al) [A] 1 * claim 1 * [Y] 25,26; | [AX]EP1803364 (CROCS INC [US]) [A] 1,25,26 * paragraphs [0045] - [0048] * [X] 2; | [X]EP1025970 (GATTI & PICCOLO S R L [IT]) [X] 2 * paragraphs [0003] - [0005] *; | [Y]EP1203539 (NOVEL WORLDWIDE TRADING CO LTD [CN]) [Y] 25,26 * paragraphs [0019] , [0021] , [0028] *; | [AX]EP0802039 (FINPROJECT SPA [IT]) [A] 1 * column 3, lines 24-41; figure - * * column 1, lines 39-54 * [X] 2 | by applicant | EP1186403 | EP1803364 | EP1203539 |