EP2105049 - Method of plant growth promotion using amide compounds [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 05.02.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.02.2010 | Refusal of application | published on 10.03.2010 [2010/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer CropScience AG Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 50 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/40] | For all designated states Bayer CropScience AG Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 50 40789 Monheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 08153581.7 | 28.03.2008 | [2009/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2105049 | Date: | 30.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A01N43/56, A01P21/00, // A01N43/54, A01N37/50, A01N43/88, A01N47/24 | [2009/40] | CPC: |
A01N43/56 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A01N43/56, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N43/56, A01N37/50, A01N43/54, A01N43/88, A01N47/24 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/40] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Förderung des Pflanzenwachstums mit Hilfe von Amidverbindungen | [2009/40] | English: | Method of plant growth promotion using amide compounds | [2009/40] | French: | Procédé de promotion de la croissance végétale faisant appel à des composés amide | [2009/40] | Examination procedure | 07.10.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2010/10] | 17.10.2009 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2010/10] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]WO2005018324 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [DX] 1-13 * page 1, paragraphs 1,6 - page 2, paragraph 1 * * page 4, paragraph 6 - page 5, paragraph 4 * * page 6, paragraphs 7,11 * * page 7: Formula (Ia) with A7 * * page 8, paragraph 7 - page 9, paragraph 2 * * page 14, paragraphs 3-5 *; | [DXY]WO03070705 (BAYER CROPSCIENCE AG [DE], et al) [DX] 1-8 * page 1, lines 8-22 * * page 5, lines 9-19 * * page 20, lines 19-21 * * page 22, lines 1-9,19-25 * * Table 1: compounds 7 - 15 * [Y] 9-13; | [Y]WO9608969 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [Y] 9-13 * page 1, lines 6-9 * * page 2, line 39 - page 3, line 8 * * page 16, lines 5-26 *; | [A]WO2007003643 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [A] 9-13 * page 1, lines 6-31 * * page 16, line 36 - page 17, line 6 * * table 3 * * examples 1-4 * | [Y] - BECK C ET AL, "IMPACT OF STROBILURINS ON PHYSIOLOGY AND YIELD FORMATION OF WHEAT", MEDEDELINGEN - FACULTEIT LANDBOUWKUNDIGE EN TOEGEPASTE BIOLOGISCHE WETENSCHAPPEN, UNIVERSITEIT GENT, GENT, BE, (20020101), vol. 67, no. 2, ISSN 1373-7503, pages 181 - 187, XP001206947 [Y] 9-13 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP0545099 | WO2005018324 | WO03070705 | WO2005123690 |