EP2020814 - Method for providing data broadcast and video apparatus using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 10.09.2010 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.09.2010 | Refusal of application | published on 13.10.2010 [2010/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 442-742 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/06] | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 416, Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 442-742 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Mun-seok 201, One Room, 1039-13 Yeongtong-dong Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Nam, Kyung-chul 306-504, Cheongmyeong-maeul Daewoo Apartment, 956-2 Yeongtong-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2009/06] | Representative(s) | Clark, David James Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | Clark, David James Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | ||
Former [2009/06] | Rooney, John-Paul Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | Application number, filing date | 08153606.2 | 28.03.2008 | [2009/06] | Priority number, date | KR20070074733 | 25.07.2007 Original published format: KR 20070074733 | [2009/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2020814 | Date: | 04.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/00 | [2009/06] | CPC: |
H04N21/8355 (EP,US);
H04N21/431 (KR);
H04N21/23614 (EP,US);
H04N21/4334 (EP,US);
H04N21/4348 (EP,US);
H04N21/4627 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [2009/41] |
Former [2009/06] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Bereitstellung eines Datenrundfunks und Videogerät damit | [2009/06] | English: | Method for providing data broadcast and video apparatus using the same | [2009/06] | French: | Procédé pour la fourniture de données diffusées et appareil vidéo l'utilisant | [2009/06] | Examination procedure | 07.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/33] | 30.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.08.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 08.09.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 11.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2010 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 18.05.2010 | 18.05.2010 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 27.05.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2010/41] | 06.06.2010 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2010/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5761669 (MONTAGUE DAVID S [US], et al) [A] 1-29* figures 3,4 *; | [X]WO0143425 (SUN MICROSYSTEMS INC [US], et al) [X] 1,13,25 * page 4, paragraph 1 * * page 8, line 21 - page 9, line 2; figure 3 *; | [A]US2003084096 (STARBUCK BRYAN [US], et al) [A] 1-29 * paragraphs [0006] , [0009] *; | [A]WO03107656 (PACE MICRO TECH PLC [GB], et al) [A] 1-29 * page 3, line 21 - page 4, line 12; figure 2; claims 1,6,7 *; | [A]WO2004072864 (NEUROCOM PTY LTD [AU], et al) [A] 2-12,14-29 * page 2, line 14 - page 3, line 4; figures 3,4 *; | [A]US2005149969 (KUMAR VISHNU [US], et al) [A] 1-29 * abstract * * paragraph [0007] *; | [X]US2006089933 (KHANDELWAL RAJESH B [US], et al) [X] 1-29 * abstract * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0030]; figure 1 * * paragraphs [0035] , [0036]; figure 3 * * paragraphs [0043] , [0044]; figure 7; claim 18 *; | [A] - WALLICH P, "Digital Hubbub", IEEE SPECTRUM IEEE USA, (200207), vol. 39, no. 7, ISSN 0018-9235, pages 26 - 31, XP002496168 [A] 1-29 * page 27, column 1, paragraph 4 - paragraph 7 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MSPEC.2002.1015362 | [A] - FENG LIN ET AL, "An Interactive Service Platform Solution Based On Enhanced Data Carousel Scheme", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20070501), vol. 53, no. 2, ISSN 0098-3063, pages 675 - 682, XP011186793 [A] 1-19 * page 1, column 1, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TCE.2007.381745 | Examination | WO03088645 | by applicant | US2005149969 | US2006089933 |