EP2006602 - Lighting device with two usable optical path lengths [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.03.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zumtobel Lighting GmbH Schweizerstrasse 30 6850 Dornbirn / AT | [2008/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ladstätter, Gerald Dammweg 5a 6833 Klaus / AT | [2016/19] |
Former [2008/52] | 01 /
Ladstätter, Gerald Dammweg 5a 6833, Klaus / AT | Representative(s) | Thun, Clemens Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/19] | Thun, Clemens Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/52] | Thun, Clemens Mitscherlich & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08153717.7 | 31.03.2008 | [2008/52] | Priority number, date | DE20071027952 | 18.06.2007 Original published format: DE102007027952 | [2008/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2006602 | Date: | 24.12.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2006602 | Date: | 11.05.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G03B21/00 | [2014/38] | CPC: |
F21V14/00 (EP,US);
F21S41/365 (EP,US);
F21S41/635 (EP);
F21S41/645 (EP);
F21S41/675 (EP);
F21V9/40 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2008/52] | F21S8/10, F21V14/00, B60Q1/00, G02B26/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/19] |
Former [2008/52] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Beleuchtungseinrichtung mit zwei nutzbaren Lichtwegen | [2008/52] | English: | Lighting device with two usable optical path lengths | [2008/52] | French: | Dispositif d'éclairage doté de deux trajectoires de lumière utiles | [2008/52] | Examination procedure | 29.05.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/31] | 08.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.02.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP09174227.0 / EP2143992 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.12.2009 | Opposition(s) | 14.02.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.03.2008 | BG | 11.05.2016 | CY | 11.05.2016 | CZ | 11.05.2016 | DK | 11.05.2016 | EE | 11.05.2016 | ES | 11.05.2016 | FI | 11.05.2016 | HR | 11.05.2016 | IT | 11.05.2016 | LT | 11.05.2016 | LV | 11.05.2016 | MC | 11.05.2016 | MT | 11.05.2016 | NL | 11.05.2016 | PL | 11.05.2016 | RO | 11.05.2016 | SE | 11.05.2016 | SI | 11.05.2016 | SK | 11.05.2016 | TR | 11.05.2016 | NO | 11.08.2016 | GR | 12.08.2016 | IS | 11.09.2016 | PT | 12.09.2016 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 31.03.2008 | |
BG | 11.05.2016 | ||
CY | 11.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2016 | ||
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
ES | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
MC | 11.05.2016 | ||
MT | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
SE | 11.05.2016 | ||
SI | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
TR | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 31.03.2008 | |
BG | 11.05.2016 | ||
CY | 11.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2016 | ||
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
ES | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
MC | 11.05.2016 | ||
MT | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
SE | 11.05.2016 | ||
SI | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2019/39] | HU | 31.03.2008 | |
BG | 11.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2016 | ||
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
ES | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
MC | 11.05.2016 | ||
MT | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
SE | 11.05.2016 | ||
SI | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 31.03.2008 | |
CZ | 11.05.2016 | ||
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
ES | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
MC | 11.05.2016 | ||
MT | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
SE | 11.05.2016 | ||
SI | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 11.05.2016 | |
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
ES | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
MC | 11.05.2016 | ||
MT | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
SE | 11.05.2016 | ||
SI | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2018/01] | CZ | 11.05.2016 | |
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
ES | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
MC | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
SE | 11.05.2016 | ||
SI | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 11.05.2016 | |
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
ES | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
SE | 11.05.2016 | ||
SI | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | CZ | 11.05.2016 | |
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
ES | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
SE | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 11.05.2016 | |
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
ES | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
SE | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | DK | 11.05.2016 | |
ES | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
SE | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | ES | 11.05.2016 | |
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
SE | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | ES | 11.05.2016 | |
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
SE | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | ES | 11.05.2016 | |
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | ES | 11.05.2016 | |
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 11.05.2016 | |
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 11.05.2016 | |
NO | 11.08.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE4202606 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]); | [X]EP0652399 (CARELLO SPA [IT]); | [X]DE19530008 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [X]DE19737653 (PATENT TREUHAND GES FUER ELEKTRISCHE GLUEHLAMPEN MBH [DE]); | [AD]DE19907943 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) | by applicant | DE19907943 |