Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
03.09.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.10.2010 [2010/40] |
14.05.2010 | Definitive list of designations | published on 16.06.2010 [2010/24] |
10.05.2010 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
30.04.2010 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
04.09.2009 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 07.10.2009 [2009/41] |