EP2107035 - A collision sensor arrangement, a method for detecting collision and a computer program product [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/41] | A collision sensor, a control unit, a collision sensor arrangement, a method for arranging a collision sensor and a computer program product | ||
[2012/52] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.05.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.06.2014 [2014/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BT Products AB 595 81 Mjölby / SE | [2013/27] |
Former [2009/41] | For all designated states BT Products AB 59581 Mjölby / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Precenth, Gert Hargsvägen 35 595 53 Mjölby / SE | 02 /
Valfridsson, Göran Ärtgränd 8 595 54 Mjölby / SE | [2009/41] | Representative(s) | Tholin, Thomas, et al Zacco Sweden AB Valhallavägen 117 Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [2014/21] |
Former [2013/27] | Herbjo̸rnsen, Rut, et al Zacco Sweden AB Valhallavägen 117 Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2009/41] | Herbjörnsen, Rut, et al Albihns AB P.O. Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 08154005.6 | 03.04.2008 | [2009/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2107035 | Date: | 07.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2107035 | Date: | 03.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B66F17/00, B60R21/0132, G01P21/00 | [2009/41] | CPC: |
B60R21/01338 (EP,US);
B66F17/003 (EP);
B60R2021/0079 (EP,US);
B60R2021/01325 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2010/24] |
Former [2009/41] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kollisionssensoranordnung, Verfahren zum Bestimmen einer Kollision und Computerprogrammprodukt | [2012/52] | English: | A collision sensor arrangement, a method for detecting collision and a computer program product | [2012/52] | French: | Agencement de capteur de collision, procédé de détection d'une collision et produit de programme informatique | [2012/52] |
Former [2009/41] | Kollisionssensor, Steuereinheit, Kollisionssensoranordnung, Verfahren zur Anordnung eines Kollisionssensors und Computerprogrammprodukt | ||
Former [2009/41] | A collision sensor, a control unit, a collision sensor arrangement, a method for arranging a collision sensor and a computer program product | ||
Former [2009/41] | Capteur de collision, unité de contrôle, agencement de capteur de collision, procédé d'agencement d'un capteur de collision et produit de programme informatique | Examination procedure | 04.11.2009 | Examination requested [2009/51] | 02.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 18.05.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR | 22.01.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.05.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 23.05.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.12.2009 | Opposition(s) | 04.04.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2003158699 (TOWNSEND CHRISTOPHER P [US] ET AL) [Y] 1-5,8-15 * paragraphs [0003] , [0023] , [0024] * * figures 1-4 *; | [Y]US2007268148 (FENNELLY JAMES P [US]) [Y] 5 * paragraph [0022] * * figures 1,2,3a *; | [XY]US2003236604 (LU JIANBO [US] ET AL) [X] 6,16 * paragraphs [0009] , [0022] , [0025] , [0033] , [0035] , [0069] , [0071] * * figures 1,2 * [Y] 7,8,17; | [Y]US6195605 (TABLER LYLE [CA] ET AL) [Y] 7,12,14,15,17 * column 7, lines 9-16 * * column 7, lines 61-65 * * figures 1,2,4 *; | [A]US2007150221 (BABALA MIKE [US] ET AL) [A] 1,5 * paragraphs [0002] , [0003] , [0005] , [0823] , [2432] , [0036] , [0041] * * figures 1,2,6 *; | [A]CN2625903Y (LI JIEKUI [CN]) [A] 1 * figure . * | [Y] - SEBASTIAN BÜTEFISCHBUTEFISCH ET AL, "Three-Axes Monolithic Silicon Low-g Accelerometer", JOURNAL OF MICROELECTROMECHANICAL SYSTEMS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20001201), vol. 9, no. 4, ISSN 1057-7157, XP011034586 [Y] 1-5,9-15 * abstract * * page 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/84.896778 |