EP2107755 - Method and apparatus for CPM session management [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.10.2013 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.11.2013 [2013/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 01250 Espoo / FI | [2009/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Haruna, Adamu Pellervonkatu 26 B 60 33540, Tampere / FI | 02 /
Rohnert, Hans Freibadstr. 14 81543, München / DE | 03 /
Sedlacek, Ivo Na Kralovkach 932 66434, Kurim / CZ | [2009/41] | Representative(s) | Kolster Oy Ab (Salmisaarenaukio 1) P.O. Box 204 00181 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2013/43] | Kolster Oy Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 23 PO Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2009/41] | Äkräs, Tapio Juhani Oy Kolster Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 23 P.O. Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 08154075.9 | 04.04.2008 | [2009/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2107755 | Date: | 07.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04L29/08 | [2009/41] | CPC: |
H04W4/10 (EP,KR,US);
H04L65/1083 (EP,KR,US);
H04L51/216 (EP,KR,US);
H04L51/56 (EP,KR,US);
H04W4/20 (EP,KR);
H04W76/45 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/41] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Verwaltung von CPM-Sitzungen | [2009/41] | English: | Method and apparatus for CPM session management | [2009/41] | French: | Méthode et appareil pour la gestion de sessions CPM | [2009/41] | Examination procedure | 22.01.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/17] | 15.04.2010 | Invitation to provide information on prior art | 09.06.2010 | Reply to the invitation to provide information on prior art | 12.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.05.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.11.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.06.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/46] | 05.07.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/46] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.10.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2013 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5832502 (DURHAM PETER E [US], et al) [X] 1,8-14 * figure 3A * * page 5, column L, lines 30-43 * * page 5, column R, lines 25-28 * [A] 2-7; | [X]US2007033250 (LEVIN DANNY [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * figures 4,7,8 * * paragraphs [0005] , [0008] , [0020] * * paragraphs [0021] - [0031] - [0042] * * paragraphs [0053] , [0070] - [0073] * * paragraphs [0080] - [0082] *; | [A]WO2007107628 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [A] 1-14 * page 1, line 18 - page 2, line 25 * * page 9, lines 19-26 * * page 16, lines 19-26 ** page 18, line 6 - page 19, line 23 *; | [X] - "Converged IP Messaging Requirements Candidate Version 1.0 ? 06 Nov 2007", INTERNET CITATION, (20071106), URL: http://member.openmobilealliance.org/ftp/Public_documents/REQ/REQ-CPM /PERMANENT_DOCUMENTS/OMA-RD_CPM-V1_0-20071106-C.ZIP, (20080410), XP002475847 [X] 1-14 * figures 1,2 * * pages 9,13 * * pages 33,40,51 * | Examination | - OMA, "Converged IP Messaging Architecture", 20080326, vol. Draft Version 1.0, no. OMA-AD-CPM-V1_0-20080325-D, (20080326), pages 1 - 33, URL: http://member.openmobilealliance.org/ftp/public_documents/COM/COM-CPM/Permanent_documents/, (20100929), XP007915144 |