EP1980790 - Electro-dynamic swirler, combustion apparatus and methods using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.05.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.06.2015 [2015/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2008/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Younsi, Abdelkrim 23 Sierra Trace Ballston Lake, NY 12019 / US | 02 /
Saddoughi, Seyed Gholamali 639 Bruno Road Clifton Park, NY 12065 / US | 03 /
Herbon, John Thomas 4 Rivercrest Drive Rexford, NY 12148 / US | 04 /
Pinigen, Florian Peter 7A Sheridan Village No 4 Schnectady, NY 12308 / US | [2008/42] | Representative(s) | Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth Global Patent Operation - Europe GE International Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | ||
Former [2008/42] | Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth GE London Patent Operation 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 08154134.4 | 07.04.2008 | [2008/42] | Priority number, date | US20070734370 | 12.04.2007 Original published format: US 734370 | [2008/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1980790 | Date: | 15.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/42] | Classification | IPC: | F23R3/28, F23R7/00, F23D11/32, F23C15/00 | [2008/42] | CPC: |
F23R3/286 (EP,US);
F23R3/14 (KR);
F02C7/00 (KR);
F23C15/00 (EP,US);
F23D11/32 (EP,US);
F23R7/00 (EP,US);
F23K2300/101 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/42] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Elektrodynamischer Verwirbler, Verbrennungsvorrichtung und Verfahren zu deren Anwendung | [2008/42] | English: | Electro-dynamic swirler, combustion apparatus and methods using the same | [2008/42] | French: | Générateur de vortex électrodynamique, appareil de combustion et procédés l'utilisant | [2008/42] | Examination procedure | 01.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/24] | 18.12.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2014 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |