EP2111850 - Use of citric acid esters as W/O emulgators [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.06.2016 Database last updated on 10.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Azelis Deutschland Kosmetik GmbH Galmesweg 65 47445 Moers / DE | [2011/19] |
Former [2009/44] | For all designated states S. Black GmbH Galmesweg 65 47445 Moers / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Seidel, Holger Im Hort 43 47055, Duisburg / DE | [2015/34] |
Former [2009/44] | 01 /
Seidel, Holger Im Hort 43 47055, Duisburg / DE | Representative(s) | Féaux de Lacroix, Stefan Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/34] | Féaux de Lacroix, Stefan Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler LLP Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [2009/44] | Féaux de Lacroix, Stefan Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler Wichmann LLP Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 08154948.7 | 22.04.2008 | [2009/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2111850 | Date: | 28.10.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2111850 | Date: | 19.08.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/06, A61Q19/00, A61K8/37 | [2015/10] | CPC: |
A61K8/06 (EP);
A61K8/37 (EP);
A61K8/375 (EP);
A61Q19/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2009/44] | A61K8/37, A61Q19/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/34] |
Former [2009/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verwendung von Citronensäureestern als W/O-Emulgatoren | [2009/44] | English: | Use of citric acid esters as W/O emulgators | [2009/44] | French: | Utilisation d'ésters d'acide citrique en tant qu'émulsifiants eau/huile | [2009/44] | Examination procedure | 27.04.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.04.2010 | Examination requested [2010/23] | 24.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.11.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.01.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.07.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.08.2010 | Opposition(s) | 20.05.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.04.2008 | BG | 19.08.2015 | CY | 19.08.2015 | CZ | 19.08.2015 | DK | 19.08.2015 | EE | 19.08.2015 | FI | 19.08.2015 | HR | 19.08.2015 | LT | 19.08.2015 | LV | 19.08.2015 | MC | 19.08.2015 | MT | 19.08.2015 | NL | 19.08.2015 | PL | 19.08.2015 | RO | 19.08.2015 | SE | 19.08.2015 | SI | 19.08.2015 | SK | 19.08.2015 | TR | 19.08.2015 | NO | 19.11.2015 | GR | 20.11.2015 | IS | 19.12.2015 | PT | 21.12.2015 | AT | 22.04.2016 | GB | 22.04.2016 | IE | 22.04.2016 | IT | 22.04.2016 | LU | 22.04.2016 | ES | 23.04.2016 | BE | 30.04.2016 | CH | 30.04.2016 | LI | 30.04.2016 | FR | 02.05.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/32] | HU | 22.04.2008 | |
CY | 19.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
HR | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
MC | 19.08.2015 | ||
MT | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SI | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
TR | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
AT | 22.04.2016 | ||
GB | 22.04.2016 | ||
IE | 22.04.2016 | ||
IT | 22.04.2016 | ||
LU | 22.04.2016 | ||
ES | 23.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
FR | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 22.04.2008 | |
CY | 19.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
HR | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
MC | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SI | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
TR | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
AT | 22.04.2016 | ||
GB | 22.04.2016 | ||
IE | 22.04.2016 | ||
IT | 22.04.2016 | ||
LU | 22.04.2016 | ||
ES | 23.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
FR | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 22.04.2008 | |
CY | 19.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
HR | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
MC | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SI | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
AT | 22.04.2016 | ||
GB | 22.04.2016 | ||
IE | 22.04.2016 | ||
IT | 22.04.2016 | ||
LU | 22.04.2016 | ||
ES | 23.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
FR | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | CZ | 19.08.2015 | |
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
HR | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SI | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
AT | 22.04.2016 | ||
GB | 22.04.2016 | ||
IE | 22.04.2016 | ||
IT | 22.04.2016 | ||
LU | 22.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
FR | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | CZ | 19.08.2015 | |
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
HR | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SI | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
GB | 22.04.2016 | ||
LU | 22.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
FR | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/08] | CZ | 19.08.2015 | |
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
HR | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SI | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
GB | 22.04.2016 | ||
LU | 22.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | CZ | 19.08.2015 | |
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
HR | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SI | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
LU | 22.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | CZ | 19.08.2015 | |
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
HR | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SI | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
LU | 22.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 19.08.2015 | |
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
HR | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SI | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | CZ | 19.08.2015 | |
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
HR | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 19.08.2015 | |
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
HR | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | DK | 19.08.2015 | |
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
HR | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/14] | FI | 19.08.2015 | |
HR | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | FI | 19.08.2015 | |
HR | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 19.08.2015 | |
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 19.08.2015 | |
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 19.08.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2007207133 (WASSELL PAUL [DK]) [X] 1-9 * paragraph [0183]; claim 1; table 12 *; | [X]GB2361927 (DANISCO [DK]) [X] 1-3,5-7 * claim 1; table 1 *; | [X]US2002146375 (SCHREIBER JORG [DE], et al) [X] 1-3 * paragraphs [0169] , [0180] * | Examination | US2007092478 | US2002102342 | by applicant | DE10331760 | DE19802206 | EP1000603 |