EP1986179 - Organic light emitting display and driving method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 24.11.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2017 | Refusal of application | published on 27.12.2017 [2017/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Display Co., Ltd. 17113, 1, Samsung-ro Giheung-Gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2015/40] |
Former [2012/39] | For all designated states Samsung Display Co., Ltd. 95, Samsung 2 Ro Giheung-Gu Yongin-City, Gyeonggi-Do, 446-711 / KR | ||
Former [2009/19] | For all designated states Samsung Mobile Display Co., Ltd. 575 Shin-dong, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | ||
Former [2008/44] | For all designated states Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 575 Shin-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Choi, Sangmoo 428-5, Gongse-ri Giheung-eup Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2008/44] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2014/19] |
Former [2008/44] | Hengelhaupt, Jürgen, et al Gulde Hengelhaupt Ziebig & Schneider Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwälte Wallstrasse 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 08155004.8 | 23.04.2008 | [2008/44] | Priority number, date | KR20070039965 | 24.04.2007 Original published format: KR 20070039965 | [2008/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1986179 | Date: | 29.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1986179 | Date: | 03.12.2008 | [2008/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/32 | [2008/44] | CPC: |
G09G3/3258 (EP,US);
G09G3/30 (KR);
G01R19/00 (KR);
G09G3/20 (KR);
G09G3/32 (KR);
G09G2320/0233 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0276 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0285 (EP,US);
G09G2320/041 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, HU [2009/33] |
Former [2008/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Organische lichtemittierende Anzeige und Verfahren zu ihrer Ansteuerung | [2008/44] | English: | Organic light emitting display and driving method thereof | [2008/44] | French: | Affichage électroluminescent organique et procédé de commande correspondant | [2008/44] | Examination procedure | 23.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/44] | 10.02.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.04.2009 | Invitation to provide information on prior art | 04.06.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 14.07.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 27.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2009 | Reply to the invitation to provide information on prior art | 12.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 26.10.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/52] | 26.10.2012 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 24.10.2017 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/52] | Appeal following examination | 21.12.2012 | Appeal received No. T0171/13 | 14.01.2013 | Statement of grounds filed | 24.10.2017 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | 24.10.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 30.10.2017 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.04.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US6414661 (SHEN ZILAN [US], et al) [X] 1-6,11-15 * abstract * * column 2, line 59 - line 65 * * column 3, line 13 - line 31 * * column 5, line 40 - column 6, line 39 * * column 7, line 41 - column 8, line 34 * [A] 7-10,16-20; | [X]US2003063081 (KIMURA MUTSUMI [JP], et al) [X] 1-6,11-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0008] * * paragraphs [0156] - [0159] * * paragraphs [0163] - [0170] * * paragraph [0177] - paragraph [0179] * * paragraphs [0183] , [0202] *; | [A]US2003160743 (YASUDA HITOSHI [JP]) [A] 10* paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0031] *; | [A]US2004046757 (YAMADA TADASHI [JP]) [A] 1-20 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraphs [0015] , [0055] *; | [X]US2004239661 (JO HIROAKI [JP]) [X] 1,2,4-6,11,12,14 * paragraphs [0007] - [0010] * * paragraphs [0033] , [0034] * * paragraphs [0073] , [0074] * * paragraph [0082] - paragraph [0089] *; | [X]US2005110420 (ARNOLD ANDREW D [US], et al) [X] 1,3,5,6,11,13,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0035] *; | [XA]US2006238943 (AWAKURA HIROKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-6,11-15 * figures 1,7-9 * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0065] * [A] 7-10,16-20; | [A]US2006279490 (PARK JONG-WOUNG [KR], et al) [A] 1-20 * abstract * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraphs [0019] , [0022] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0077] - paragraph [0105] *; | [PX]US7355574 (LEON FELIPE A [US], et al) [PX] 1-6,11-15 * abstract * * column 4, line 35 - column 5, line 28 * | Examination | EP1231592 | US2005110786 |