EP2045421 - Lock [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.06.2010 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.07.2010 [2010/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lips Nederland B.V. Meerval 5 4941 SK Raamsdonksveer / NL | [2009/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Praet, Petrus Johannes Laurentius Binnen Walevest 97 3311 AA Dordrecht / NL | 02 /
Schoen, Niels Snelfilterweg 32 3063 JH Rotterdam / NL | [2009/15] | Representative(s) | Bras, Pieter Octrooibureau Vriesendorp & Gaade B.V. Koninginnegracht 19 2514 AB Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/15] | Bras, Pieter Octrooibureau Vriesendorp & Gaade B.V. Dr. Kuyperstraat 6 2514 BB Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 08155298.6 | 28.04.2008 | [2009/15] | Priority number, date | NL20071033780 | 27.04.2007 Original published format: NL 1033780 | [2009/15] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2045421 | Date: | 08.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2045421 | Date: | 08.07.2009 | [2009/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | E05B55/12, E05B63/04, E05B63/06, // E05B41/00, E05B63/20, E05C1/16 | [2009/15] | CPC: |
E05B63/06 (EP);
E05B55/12 (EP);
E05B63/042 (EP);
E05B41/00 (EP);
E05B63/202 (EP);
E05C1/166 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2010/11] |
Former [2009/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Schloss | [2009/15] | English: | Lock | [2009/15] | French: | Verrou | [2009/15] | Examination procedure | 30.09.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 11.11.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 09.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/29] | 17.02.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2010/29] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2010 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO9932745 (SCHLAGE LOCK CO [US]) [X] 1,2,4,7,8,13 * page 1, line 5 - page 4, line 20 * * page 6, line 13 - page 7, line 28; figure - * [A] 3; | [XA]US5501492 (KAJUCH PETE [US]) [X] 1,2,4,7,8,13 * column 1, line 6 - column 4, line 19; figure - * [A] 3,9; | [X]US4902057 (CHING HUI P [HK]) [X] 1,7,13 * the whole document * |