EP1992906 - Bragg network extensometer and measurement device comprising at least one such extensometer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.04.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.04.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.05.2012 [2012/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Énergie Atomique et aux Énergies Alternatives Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 25, rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/18] | For all designated states Commissariat à l'énergie atomique et aux énergies alternatives Bâtiment D "Le Ponant" 25, rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Commissariat A L'Energie Atomique - CEA 25 Rue Leblanc, Immeuble "Le Ponant D" 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rougeault, Stéphane 143, rue Houdan 92330, SCEAUX / FR | 02 /
Ferdinand, Pierre 96, rue des Martyrs de la Résistance 78800, HOUILLES / FR | 03 /
Laffont, Guillaume 6, rue André Messager 78390, BOIS D'ARCY / FR | [2008/47] | Representative(s) | Ilgart, Jean-Christophe BREVALEX 95, Rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | Ilgart, Jean-Christophe BREVALEX 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 08155634.2 | 05.05.2008 | [2008/47] | Priority number, date | FR20070055114 | 16.05.2007 Original published format: FR 0755114 | [2008/47] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1992906 | Date: | 19.11.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.09.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G01B11/02 | [2008/47] | CPC: |
G01B11/18 (EP);
G01L1/246 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/47] | Title | German: | Bragg-Gitter-Extensometer und Messvorrichtung, die mindestens einen solchen Extensometer umfasst | [2008/47] | English: | Bragg network extensometer and measurement device comprising at least one such extensometer | [2008/47] | French: | Extensomètre a réseau de bragg et dispositif de mesure comportant au moins un tel extensomètre | [2008/47] | Examination procedure | 29.10.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/25] | 01.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/21] | 10.01.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2011 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP1124112 (NTT ADVANCED TECH KK [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,11 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0047] * * claim 1 * * figure 2 * [Y] 3-10,12-14; | [Y]US2005183499 (BIESTER KLAUS [DE], et al) [Y] 3 * the whole document *; | [DY]EP0867688 (GLOETZL BAUMESSTECH [DE]) [DY] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [DY]FR2850745 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]) [DY] 1-14 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP0867688 | FR2850745 |