EP1996003 - Flexible Print Circuit And Liquid Crystal Display Device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.08.2012 [2012/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Funai Electric Co., Ltd. 7-7-1 Nakagaito Daito-shi Osaka 574-0013 / JP | [2008/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sakikubo, Takayuki c/0 FUNAI ELECTRIC CO., LTD., 7-7-1, Nakagaito, Daito-shi Osaka 574-0013 / JP | [2008/48] | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/45] | Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/48] | Erny, Tobias Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08155822.3 | 07.05.2008 | [2008/48] | Priority number, date | JP20070136297 | 23.05.2007 Original published format: JP 2007136297 | [2008/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1996003 | Date: | 26.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1996003 | Date: | 04.11.2009 | [2009/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1996003 | Date: | 24.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H05K3/36 | [2008/48] | CPC: |
H05K3/363 (EP,US);
H05K1/0269 (EP,US);
H05K2201/058 (EP,US);
H05K2201/09781 (EP,US);
H05K2201/09918 (EP,US);
H05K2203/166 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, PL [2010/27] |
Former [2008/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Flexible gedruckte Schaltung und Flüssigkristallanzeigevorrichtung | [2008/48] | English: | Flexible Print Circuit And Liquid Crystal Display Device | [2008/48] | French: | Circuit d'impression flexible et dispositif d'affichage à cristaux liquides | [2008/48] | Examination procedure | 25.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/18] | 27.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.05.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 12.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 03.02.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.05.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 31.05.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.04.2010 | Opposition(s) | 25.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH11121894 (OPTREX KK) [X] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]US2006067066 (MEIER PASCAL C [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1544948 (PALO ALTO RES CT INC [US]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [PA]US2007169136 (HIRAMATSU HIROMICHI [JP], et al) [PA] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]US2004106306 (MIYAMURA YUKIHARU [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]US2005258153 (SHI ZHONG-YOU JOE [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * the whole document * |