EP2090394 - Methods for cutting a panel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCM Group S.p.A. Via Emilia 77 47900 Rimini / IT | [2009/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Spazzoli, Andrea Via Giovanni XXIII 16 47814 Bellaria Igea Marina (RN) / IT | [2009/34] | Representative(s) | Crugnola, Pietro, et al Luppi Intellectual Property Srl Viale Corassori, 54 41124 Modena / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2010/25] | Crugnola, Pietro, et al Luppi Crugnola & Partners S.r.l. Viale Corassori 54 41124 Modena / IT | ||
Former [2009/34] | Crugnola, Pietro, et al Luppi & Associati S.r.l. Via Camperio 11 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 08155893.4 | 08.05.2008 | [2009/34] | Priority number, date | IT2007MO00158 | 11.05.2007 Original published format: IT MO20070158 | [2009/34] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2090394 | Date: | 19.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2090394 | Date: | 27.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2090394 | Date: | 27.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B23D59/00, B27B5/06 | [2009/34] | CPC: |
B23D59/008 (EP);
B27B5/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE [2013/45] |
Former [2009/34] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Schneiden einer Platte | [2009/34] | English: | Methods for cutting a panel | [2009/34] | French: | Procédés de coupe d'un panneau | [2009/34] | Examination procedure | 11.09.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 05.02.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 26.09.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.09.2013 | Examination requested [2013/45] | 28.09.2013 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 07.11.2013 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 20.03.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.07.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 18.07.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.07.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.03.2014 | Opposition(s) | 28.05.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19801183 (HOLZMA MASCHINENBAU GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-14,16-18 * column 3, line 44 - column 5, line 26; figure 1 *; | [A]DE3111256 (SCHELLING & CO [AT]) [A] 1-14,16-18 * page 6, paragraph 3 - page 8, paragraph 1; figures 1-9 *; | [A]DE19522717 (DUERKOPP ADLER AG [DE]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 17 - line 44 * * column 5, line 10 - line 19; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US2005277104 (MORIMOTO SHINJI [JP] ET AL) [A] 1 * paragraph [0044]; figures 1,4 *; | [X]EP1362676 (REICH SPEZIALMASCHINEN GMBH [DE]) [X] 15-18 * paragraph [0039]; figure 5 *; | [A]DE19950494 (GRUBER BRUNO [DE]) [A] 15 * the whole document * |