EP2123781 - Amorphous alloy and method for producing products made thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.10.2010 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.11.2010 [2010/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OCAS N.V. - Onderzoekscentrum voor Aanwending van Staal John Kennedylaan 3 9060 Zelzate / BE | [2009/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ruiz Romera, Daniel Pres. J.F. Kennedylaan 3 9060 Zelzate / BE | 02 /
Claessens, Serge Pres. J.F. Kennedylaan 3 9060 Zelzate / BE | 03 /
De Wulf, Marc Pres. J.F. Kennedylaan 3 9060 Zelzate / BE | 04 /
Van Steenberge, Nele Pres. J.F. Kennedylaan 3 9060 Zelzate / BE | 05 /
Antonissen, Joachim Pres. J.F. Kennedylaan 3 9060 Zelzate / BE | [2009/48] | Representative(s) | Pronovem Office Van Malderen Avenue Josse Goffin 158 1082 Bruxelles / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | pronovem Office Van Malderen Avenue Josse Goffin 158 1082 Bruxelles / BE | Application number, filing date | 08155922.1 | 08.05.2008 | [2009/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2123781 | Date: | 25.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C22C1/00, C22C33/00, C22C33/04, C22C33/06, C22C45/00, C22C45/02, C22C45/04 | [2009/48] | CPC: |
C22C1/00 (EP);
C22C1/11 (EP);
C22C27/02 (EP);
C22C33/003 (EP);
C22C33/06 (EP);
C22C38/002 (EP);
C22C38/004 (EP);
C22C45/008 (EP);
C22C45/02 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2010/30] |
Former [2009/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Amorphe Legierung und Herstellungsverfahren für Produkte daraus | [2009/48] | English: | Amorphous alloy and method for producing products made thereof | [2009/48] | French: | Alliage amorphe et procédé de production de produits fabriqués à partir de celui-ci | [2009/48] | Examination procedure | 26.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/47] | 05.07.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2010/47] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2010 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5160379 (YOSHIZAWA YOSHIHITO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2 * abstract *; | [A]EP0529634 (KAWASAKI STEEL CO [JP]) [A] 14,15* claim 3 *; | [X]US2001054330 (BIZEN YOSHIO [JP], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0022] , [0023]; examples 18-20; table 4 *; | [X]US2003041931 (SUNAKAWA JUN [JP], et al) [X] 1,3 * paragraph [0099]; example 6; table 8 *; | [XA] - R.BARRUE ET AL, "Influence of substitution elements on magnetic and thermal properties of amorphous Fe79 B16 Si5 ribbons", PHYSICA SCRIPTA, (1988), vol. 37, pages 356 - 358, XP009107822 [X] 1,3 * page 356, column L, paragraph 2 - column R; table 1 * [A] 8,11-13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/0031-8949/37/3/009 |