EP2119697 - Process for preparing substituted biphenylanilides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 26.03.2010 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.2010 | Refusal of application | published on 28.04.2010 [2010/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer CropScience AG Gebäude 6100 Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 50 40789 Monheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/47] | For all designated states Bayer CropScience AG BCS-BPA-LP-PL Gebäude 6100 Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 50 40789 Monheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 08155977.5 | 09.05.2008 | [2009/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2119697 | Date: | 18.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C07C231/12 | [2009/47] | CPC: |
C07C231/12 (EP,KR,US);
B01J31/18 (KR);
C07C233/05 (KR);
C07F5/02 (KR)
| C-Set: |
C07C231/12, C07C233/15 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/47] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung substituierter Biphenylanilin | [2009/47] | English: | Process for preparing substituted biphenylanilides | [2009/47] | French: | Procédé pour la synthèse de diphénylanilines substituées | [2009/47] | Examination procedure | 30.11.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2010/17] | 10.12.2009 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2010/17] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO03070705 (BAYER CROPSCIENCE AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-15 * examples 2,Verfahren,B *; | [X]US6958330 (AUDIA JAMES E [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * column 44, lines 4-15 *; | [X]WO2006092429 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-15* the whole document *; | [X]DE102006036222 (BAYER CROPSCIENCE AG [DE]) [X] 1-15 * example 2 *; | [X] - TSUTOMU ISHIKAWA ET AL, "Anomalous substituent effects in the bischler-napieralski reaction of 2-aryl aromatic formamides", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, EASTON.; US, (20000101), vol. 65, no. 26, ISSN 0022-3263, pages 9143 - 9151, XP002957700 [X] 1-15 * Scheme 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo0012849 | by applicant | EP0888261 | WO03070705 | WO2006092429 | WO2007138089 | - TETRAHEDRON LETT., (1991), vol. 32, page 2277 | - R.M. WASHBURN ET AL., ORGANIC SYNTHESES COLLECTIVE, vol. 4, page 68 | - Boronic Acids, WILEY-VCH, (2005), page 28FF | - Boronic Acids, WILEY, (2005), page 28FF | - SERWATOWSKI ET AL., TETRAHEDRON LETT., (2003), vol. 44, page 7329 | - H.C. BROWN ET AL., J. ORGANOMET. CHEM., (1988), vol. 73, page 1 | - J. SERWATOWSKI ET AL., TETRAHEDRON LETT., (2003), vol. 44, page 7329 | - MAX BERGMANN; LEONIDAS ZERVAS, "Uber ein allgemeines Verfahren der Peptid-Synthese", BERICHTE DER DEUTSCHEN CHEMISCHEN GESELLSCHAFT, (1932), vol. 65, no. 7, pages 1192 - 1201, XP000612116 | - J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1960), vol. 82, page 5688 | - J. CHEM. SOC. C, (1969), page 1758 | - G. A. GRASA ET AL., ORGANOMETALLICS, (2002), vol. 21, page 2866 | - A. ZAPF ET AL., CHEM. EUR. J., (2000), vol. 6, page 1830 | - D. ZIM ET AL., TETRAHEDRON LETT., (2000), vol. 41, page 8199 | - J. HASSAN ET AL., CHEM. REV., (2002), vol. 102, page 1359 |