EP2119465 - Nebulizer with breathing phase detecting sensor for delivering nebulized drugs to a user [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.04.2012 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.05.2012 [2012/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Air Liquide Medical Systems S.p.A. Via dei Prati 62 25073 Bovezzo / IT | [2010/07] |
Former [2009/47] | For all designated states Markos Mefar S.P.A. Via dei Prati 62 25073 Bovezzo / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rivetti, Alberto c/o Markos Mefar Spa Via dei Prati 62 25073 Bovezzo / IT | 02 /
Giaretta, Mariano Via Moro Aldo Liscate, MI / IT | [2009/47] | Representative(s) | Pittis, Olivier L'Air Liquide, S.A. Service Brevets & Marques 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/47] | Pittis, Olivier L'Air Liquide, S.A., Service Brevets & Marques, 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 08156374.4 | 16.05.2008 | [2009/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2119465 | Date: | 18.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61M15/00, B05B17/06, // A61M16/00 | [2009/47] | CPC: |
A61M15/0085 (EP);
A61M15/0083 (EP);
B05B17/0623 (EP);
B05B17/0638 (EP);
B05B17/0676 (EP);
A61M2016/0021 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/47] | Title | German: | Vernebler mit Atemphasenerkennungssensor zur Verabreichung vernebelter Arzneimittel an einen Benutzer | [2009/47] | English: | Nebulizer with breathing phase detecting sensor for delivering nebulized drugs to a user | [2009/47] | French: | Nébuliseur doté d'un capteur de détection de la phase respiratoire pour l'administration de médicaments nébulisés à un utilisateur | [2009/47] | Examination procedure | 16.05.2008 | Examination requested [2009/47] | 17.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/22] | 09.01.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/22] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.12.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2011 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US6142146 (ABRAMS ANDREW L [US], et al) [X] 17 * column 5, line 36 - column 9, line 27; figures 1-9 * [Y] 1,3-15; | [XY]US3812854 (BUCKLES R, et al) [X] 17 * column 3, line 20 - column 8, line 62; figures 1,2 * [Y] 1,2; | [Y]US2004045547 (YAMAMOTO HIROHITO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0076] - paragraph [0091] *; | [Y]US6877382 (GOURLAY ROBERT D [US]) [Y] 8,13 * column 2, line 23 - line 45; figure - * * column 10, line 18 - column 12, line 52; figure - *; | [Y]US2005022815 (FROLA FRANK R [US]) [Y] 15 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0017]; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2005268909 (BONNEY STANLEY G [GB], et al) [A] 1,17 * paragraph [0123] * * paragraph [0042] *; | [AD]EP0635312 (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO [JP]) [AD] 1,2 * column 9, line 42 - column 14, line 18; figures 1,2 *; | [A]GB2395437 (PROFILE RESPIRATORY SYSTEMS LT [GB]) [A] 1,3,6,17 * page 9, line 8 - page 21, line 10; figures 3-6,10 *; | [A]WO2008010425 (CANON KK [JP], et al) [A] 1,3,6,17 * page 6, line 3 - page 15, line 3; figures 1-3 * | by applicant | US4796807 | US4850534 | EP0933138 | EP0635312 |