Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2009112335 | Global Dossier | 17.09.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0809019 | 19.05.2008 | EP08102478 | 11.03.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2009112334 | Global Dossier | 17.09.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP08156460 | 19.05.2008 | EP08102478 | 11.03.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8802406 | Global Dossier | 12.08.2014 | B2 | US2014038252 | 06.02.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201314051264 | 10.10.2013 | GB0809019 | 19.05.2008 | US73610111 | 01.11.2011 | WO2009EP51966 | 19.02.2009 | EP08102478 | 11.03.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8586335 | Global Dossier | 19.11.2013 | B2 | US2012040427 | 16.02.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0809019 | 19.05.2008 | WO2009EP51966 | 19.02.2009 | EP08102478 | 11.03.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8697405 | Global Dossier | 15.04.2014 | B2 | US2010330640 | 30.12.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP08156460 | 19.05.2008 | WO2009EP51963 | 19.02.2009 | EP08102478 | 11.03.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2336345 | Global Dossier | 08.02.2012 | B1 | EP2336345 | 22.06.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP08156460 | 19.05.2008 | EP11161435 | 19.02.2009 | EP09721127 | 19.02.2009 | EP08102478 | 11.03.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2262903 | Global Dossier | 22.12.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP09719871 | 19.02.2009 | GB0809019 | 19.05.2008 | WO2009EP51966 | 19.02.2009 | EP08102478 | 11.03.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2257633 | Global Dossier | 23.11.2011 | B1 | EP2257633 | 08.12.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP08156460 | 19.05.2008 | WO2009EP51963 | 19.02.2009 | EP09721127 | 19.02.2009 | EP08102478 | 11.03.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2100964 | Global Dossier | 16.09.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP08102478 | 11.03.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE534744T | 15.12.2011 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP08156460 | 19.05.2008 | WO2009EP51963 | 19.02.2009 | EP08102478 | 11.03.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE544863T | 15.02.2012 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP08156460 | 19.05.2008 | EP08102478 | 11.03.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2376709T | 16.03.2012 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP08156460 | 19.05.2008 | WO2009EP51963 | 19.02.2009 | EP08102478 | 11.03.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2378406T | 12.04.2012 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP08156460 | 19.05.2008 | EP08102478 | 11.03.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB0809019D0 | 25.06.2008 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB0809019 | 19.05.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW200946679 | 16.11.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | EP08156460 | 19.05.2008 | EP08102478 | 11.03.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2123766 | Global Dossier | 25.11.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP08156460 | 19.05.2008 |