EP1995797 - Superconductive wire and method for producing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.06.2013 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.07.2013 [2013/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/48] | For all designated states Hitachi Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takahashi, Masaya c/o HITACHI, Ltd. 12th Floor, Marunouchi Center Building, 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 02 /
Tanaka, Kazuhide c/o HITACHI, Ltd. 12th Floor, Marunouchi Center Building, 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 03 /
Okada, Michiya c/o HITACHI, Ltd. 12th Floor, Marunouchi Center Building, 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | [2008/48] | Representative(s) | Leszczynski, André Cabinet Nony 3, rue de Penthièvre 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/48] | Leszczynski, André NONY & ASSOCIES 3, rue de Penthièvre 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 08156635.8 | 21.05.2008 | [2008/48] | Priority number, date | JP20070133851 | 21.05.2007 Original published format: JP 2007133851 | [2008/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1995797 | Date: | 26.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1995797 | Date: | 26.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H01L39/14, H01L39/24, C04B35/65, C22C29/14, C04B35/58 | [2012/39] | CPC: |
C04B35/58057 (EP,US);
H10N60/202 (EP,US);
H10N60/0856 (EP,US);
C04B2235/401 (EP,US);
C04B2235/421 (EP,US);
C04B2235/6581 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2008/48] | H01L39/14, H01L39/24 | Designated contracting states | CH, FR, LI [2013/22] |
Former [2008/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Supraleitender Draht und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | [2008/48] | English: | Superconductive wire and method for producing the same | [2008/48] | French: | Fil supraconducteur et méthode de le produire | [2008/48] | Examination procedure | 21.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/48] | 05.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.01.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/29] | 21.02.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/29] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.09.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]WO02069353 (IND RES LTD [NZ], et al); | [XY]US2002164418 (FISCHER CLAUS [DE], et al) | by applicant | JPH06131927 | JPH06203667 | JP2004319107 | JP2005063769 |