|
15.02.2021 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.10.2020 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.04.2020 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.03.2020 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.03.2020 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.2020 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.02.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.02.2020 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.02.2020 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.2020 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.02.2020 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.02.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.01.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.01.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.01.2020 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.10.2019 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.10.2019 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.10.2019 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.10.2019 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
16.10.2019 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
02.09.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.09.2019 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.08.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.08.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.08.2019 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.08.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.08.2019 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.08.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.08.2019 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.08.2019 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.07.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.07.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.07.2019 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.07.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.07.2019 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.07.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.07.2019 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.05.2019 |
Confirmation of revocation of automatic debit order |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.05.2019 |
Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.05.2019 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.2019 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
05.03.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.02.2019 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.02.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.02.2019 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.11.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.11.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.11.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.11.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.11.2018 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.09.2018 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.09.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.09.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.05.2018 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.05.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.05.2018 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.04.2018 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.01.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.01.2018 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.01.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.01.2018 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.01.2018 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.01.2018 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.01.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.07.2017 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.06.2017 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.06.2017 |
Document annexed to the Extended European Search Report |
Search / examination |
84 |
|
22.06.2017 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.06.2017 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.06.2017 |
Information on Search Strategy |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.05.2017 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.07.2014 |
Late/insufficient payment of the renewal fee without additional fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.07.2013 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.07.2013 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.07.2009 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.10.2008 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.06.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.06.2008 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
09.06.2008 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
21.05.2008 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.05.2008 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.05.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.05.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
21.05.2008 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.05.2008 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.05.2008 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |