24.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] |
10.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.07.2022 [2022/28] |
03.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.07.2022 [2022/27] |
27.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.06.2022 [2022/26] |
14.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.06.2021 [2021/24] |
07.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.06.2021 [2021/23] |
30.04.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.06.2021 [2021/22] |
16.04.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.05.2021 [2021/20] |
12.03.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.04.2021 [2021/15] |
05.03.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.04.2021 [2021/14] |
26.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.03.2021 [2021/13] |
19.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.03.2021 [2021/12] |
12.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.03.2021 [2021/11] |
12.02.2021 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 17.03.2021 [2021/11] |
05.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.03.2021 [2021/10] |
29.01.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.03.2021 [2021/09] |
22.01.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.02.2021 [2021/08] |
04.12.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.01.2021 [2021/01] |
13.11.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.12.2020 [2020/51] |
06.11.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.12.2020 [2020/50] |
30.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.12.2020 [2020/49] |
23.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.11.2020 [2020/48] |
16.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.11.2020 [2020/47] |
09.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.11.2020 [2020/46] |
09.10.2020 |
Change - applicant |
published on 11.11.2020 [2020/46] |
06.03.2020 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] |
28.02.2020 |
Change - representative |
|
28.02.2020 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
14.02.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
14.02.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
15.10.2019 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
02.09.2019 |
New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings |
|
24.05.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.05.2019 |
Change - representative |
|
18.02.2019 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
19.11.2018 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
21.09.2018 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
05.06.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.05.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
27.04.2018 |
First examination report |
|
02.03.2018 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 04.04.2018 [2018/14] |
06.02.2018 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
02.02.2018 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
02.02.2018 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 07.03.2018 [2018/10] |
02.02.2018 |
Change - designated states |
published on 07.03.2018 [2018/10] |
07.07.2017 |
Change - classification |
published on 09.08.2017 [2017/32] |
07.07.2017 |
Change - classification |
published on 09.08.2017 [2017/32] |
23.06.2017 |
Publication of search report |
published on 26.07.2017 [2017/30] |
02.06.2017 |
Change - classification |
published on 05.07.2017 [2017/27] |
02.06.2017 |
Change - classification |
published on 05.07.2017 [2017/27] |
02.06.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.05.2017 |
Change - classification |
published on 28.06.2017 [2017/26] |
26.05.2017 |
Change - classification |
published on 28.06.2017 [2017/26] |
03.06.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.06.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.01.2015 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
27.01.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.07.2014 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
07.06.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.06.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.06.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.06.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
31.07.2009 |
Change - representative |
published on 02.09.2009 [2009/36] |
24.10.2008 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 26.11.2008 [2008/48] |