EP2123594 - Industrial lift truck with speed control [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.10.2010 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.11.2010 [2010/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BT Products AB 595 81 Mjölby / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | For all designated states BT Products AB 59581 Mjölby / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Arnsby, Mattias Hagmarksgatan 7c 582 17 Linköping / SE | [2009/48] | Representative(s) | Norberg, Charlotte, et al Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Norberg, Charlotte, et al Albihns AB P.O. Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 08156829.7 | 23.05.2008 | [2009/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2123594 | Date: | 25.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B66F9/075, B66F9/08, B66F9/22, B66F9/24, F15B11/05 | [2009/48] | CPC: |
B66F9/0755 (EP);
B66F9/08 (EP);
B66F9/22 (EP);
F15B2211/20546 (EP);
F15B2211/6336 (EP);
F15B2211/6346 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2010/30] |
Former [2009/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Industriegabelstapler mit Geschwindigkeitssteuerung | [2009/48] | English: | Industrial lift truck with speed control | [2009/48] | French: | Chariot élévateur industriel doté d'un contrôle de la vitesse | [2009/48] | Examination procedure | 26.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/46] | 01.07.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2010/46] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2010 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]GB2196447 (JUNGHEINRICH KG) [X] 1,6,9 * page 3, line 63 - page 4, line 32 * * page 4, lines 44-47 * * page 4, lines 60-63 * * page 5, lines 24-26 * * page 7, lines 15-19 * * claims 1,2 * * figure - * [Y] 2-5,7,8,10-12; | [X]US2008034853 (TABOR KEITH A [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0008] , [0017] , [0024] , [0026] , [0035] * * figure - *; | [XY]GB2099184 (TOYODA AUTOMATIC LOOM WORKS, et al) [X] 1 * page 3, line 28 - page 4, line 38 * * page 6, lines 113-122 * * page 5, lines 120-130 * * page 7, lines 11-18 * * figures 1,2,5,8,11,12,14,19-21 * [Y] 10-12; | [X]EP1052215 (DAMBACH LAGERSYSTEME GMBH [DE]) [X] 1 * abstract * * paragraph [0007] * * figure . *; | [XY]JPH0398997 (TOYODA AUTOMATIC LOOM WORKS) [X] 1 * abstract * * figures 1,2 * [Y] 8; | [X]US6374153 (BRANDT EVERETT G [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 2, line 40 - column 5, line 62 * * figures 1,2.,3 *; | [YA]EP1593645 (BT IND [SE]) [Y] 2-5,7 * paragraphs [0002] , [0005] , [0007] , [0013] , [0014] , [0016] , [0017] * * figure - * [A] 1; | [DA]US2005263354 (PERKINS GERARD T [US]) [DA] 1,2,4,5 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0866026 (JUNGHEINRICH AG [DE]) [A] 1,2 * column 3, line 41 - column 4, line 38 * * figures 1,2,4 * | by applicant | US2005263354 |