Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7956831 | Global Dossier | 07.06.2011 | B2 | US2008297452 | 04.12.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75556207 | 30.05.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101549507B | Global Dossier | 02.09.2015 | B1 | KR20080106035 | 04.12.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US75556207 | 30.05.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5599555B | Global Dossier | 01.10.2014 | B2 | JP2008299331 | 11.12.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US75556207 | 30.05.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1998312 | Global Dossier | 21.06.2017 | B1 | EP1998312 | 14.04.2010 | A3 | EP1998312 | 03.12.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US75556207 | 30.05.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101315744B | 31.08.2016 | B | CN101315744 | 03.12.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US75556207 | 30.05.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI435303B | 21.04.2014 | B | TW200917199 | 16.04.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US75556207 | 30.05.2007 |