EP1998312 - Apparatus, systems, and methods for dimming an active matrix light-emitting diode (LED) display [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2018 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.05.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.05.2018 [2018/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 115 Tabor Road Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | [2015/51] |
Former [2008/49] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road P.O. Box 2245 Morristown NJ 07960 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Roush, Jerry A. 5923 W. Hedgehog Pl. Phoenix, AZ 85085 / US | 02 /
Sarma, Kalluri R. 2352 S. Los Altos Ave. Mesa, AZ 85202 / US | 03 /
Schmidt, John F. L. 1314 E. Victor Hugo Ave Phoenix, AZ 85022 / US | [2008/49] | Representative(s) | Houghton, Mark Phillip, et al Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell, Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [2017/25] |
Former [2008/49] | Buckley, Guy Julian Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 08156876.8 | 23.05.2008 | [2008/49] | Priority number, date | US20070755562 | 30.05.2007 Original published format: US 755562 | [2008/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1998312 | Date: | 03.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1998312 | Date: | 14.04.2010 | [2010/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1998312 | Date: | 21.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/32, G09G3/3233, // G09G3/20 | [2017/07] | CPC: |
G09G3/3233 (EP,US);
G09G3/32 (KR);
G09G3/30 (KR);
G09G2300/0814 (EP,US);
G09G2300/0861 (EP,US);
G09G2310/0262 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2010/15] | G09G3/32, // G09G3/20 | ||
Former IPC [2008/49] | G09G3/32 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2017/25] |
Former [2010/51] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung, Systeme und Verfahren zur Verdunkelung einer Leuchtdioden (LED)-Aktivmatrixanzeige | [2008/49] | English: | Apparatus, systems, and methods for dimming an active matrix light-emitting diode (LED) display | [2008/49] | French: | Appareil, systèmes et procédé de gradation d'un affichage à diode luminescente à matrice active (LED) | [2008/49] | Examination procedure | 23.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/49] | 26.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 18.11.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 15.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.01.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 17.01.2017 | 17.01.2017 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 10.02.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 11.05.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.05.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.03.2010 | Opposition(s) | 22.03.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 08.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2005104820 (KOMIYA NAOAKI [KR]) [I] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0062]; figures 4,5a,6a,7a * | by applicant | US2005104820 |