EP1995380 - Device for collecting liquids along railway tracks [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.08.2010 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.09.2010 [2010/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fasano, Osvaldo Strada del Lupo, 6 10090 Villarbasse (TO) / IT | [2008/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2008/48] | Representative(s) | Buzzi, Franco Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele ll, 6 10123 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/48] | Buzzi, Franco c/o Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx Via Maria Vittoria 18 10123 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 08156928.7 | 26.05.2008 | [2008/48] | Priority number, date | IT2007TO00371 | 25.05.2007 Original published format: IT TO20070371 | [2008/48] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1995380 | Date: | 26.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1995380 | Date: | 16.09.2009 | [2009/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | E01B19/00 | [2008/48] | CPC: |
E01B19/006 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | [2010/20] |
Former [2008/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Sammeln von Flüssigkeiten längs von Bahnlinien | [2008/48] | English: | Device for collecting liquids along railway tracks | [2008/48] | French: | Appareil pour recueillir des liquides le long des chemins de fer | [2008/48] | Examination procedure | 17.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/36] | 22.04.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2010/36] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2010 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE19617380 (PROLUXRAIL HOLDING SA [LU]) [X] 1-3,5-10 * column 4, line 7 - column 7, line 7; figure - *; | [X]DE20007465U (INTERVIA GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1,2,4-10 * page 7, paragraph L - page 15, paragraph L; figure - *; | [A]DE9321425U (FRENZEL OTTO BAUUNTERNEHMEN [DE]) [A] 5 * figure 5 *; | [A]EP0781886 (GEOTEC SYSTEME FUER SAUBERE UM [DE]) [A] 8 * figure 1 * | by applicant | EP1574618 |