EP2006958 - Electrical connection system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.01.2014 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Delphi Technologies, Inc. P.O. Box 5052 Troy, MI 48007 / US | [2013/10] |
Former [2008/52] | For all designated states Delphi Technologies, Inc. P.O. Box 5052 Troy, Michigan 48007 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hsieh, Shao C. 2299 Henn Hyde Rd. NW. Warren, OH 44484 / US | 02 /
McCall, Mark D. 6058 Richards Avenue Hubbard, OH 44425 / US | [2008/52] | Representative(s) | Robert, Vincent Delphi France SAS Bât. le Raspail - ZAC Paris Nord 2 22, avenue des Nations CS 65059 Villepinte 95972 Roissy CDG Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/10] | Robert, Vincent Delphi France SAS Bât. le Raspail - ZAC Paris Nord 2 22, avenue des Nations CS 65059 Villepinte 95972 Roissy CDG Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2008/52] | Denton, Michael John, et al Delphi France SAS 64 Avenue de la Plaine de France ZAC Paris Nord II B.P. 65059, Tremblay en France 95972 Roissy Charles de Gaulle Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 08157119.2 | 28.05.2008 | [2008/52] | Priority number, date | US20070821248 | 22.06.2007 Original published format: US 821248 | [2008/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2006958 | Date: | 24.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2006958 | Date: | 14.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2006958 | Date: | 06.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/426, H01R13/641, H01R13/58, // H01R13/11, H01R13/187, H01R13/52 | [2011/46] | CPC: |
H01R13/5812 (EP,US);
H01R11/01 (KR);
H01R13/426 (EP,US);
H01R13/64 (KR);
H01R13/641 (EP,US);
H01R13/113 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2008/52] | H01R13/426, H01R13/641, H01R13/58, H01R13/11, H01R13/187, // H01R13/11, H01R13/187 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/52] | Title | German: | Elektrisches Verbindungssystem | [2008/52] | English: | Electrical connection system | [2008/52] | French: | Système de connexion électrique | [2008/52] | Examination procedure | 14.09.2012 | Examination requested [2012/43] | 19.10.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.01.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 25.01.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.10.2012 | Opposition(s) | 09.12.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.05.2008 | AT | 06.03.2013 | BE | 06.03.2013 | CY | 06.03.2013 | CZ | 06.03.2013 | DK | 06.03.2013 | EE | 06.03.2013 | FI | 06.03.2013 | HR | 06.03.2013 | LT | 06.03.2013 | LV | 06.03.2013 | MC | 06.03.2013 | MT | 06.03.2013 | NL | 06.03.2013 | PL | 06.03.2013 | RO | 06.03.2013 | SE | 06.03.2013 | SI | 06.03.2013 | SK | 06.03.2013 | TR | 06.03.2013 | IE | 28.05.2013 | LU | 28.05.2013 | CH | 31.05.2013 | LI | 31.05.2013 | BG | 06.06.2013 | GB | 06.06.2013 | NO | 06.06.2013 | GR | 07.06.2013 | ES | 17.06.2013 | IS | 06.07.2013 | PT | 08.07.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
BE | 06.03.2013 | ||
CY | 06.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.03.2013 | ||
DK | 06.03.2013 | ||
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
HR | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
MC | 06.03.2013 | ||
MT | 06.03.2013 | ||
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
PL | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
TR | 06.03.2013 | ||
IE | 28.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
GB | 06.06.2013 | ||
NO | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
IS | 06.07.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2015/13] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
BE | 06.03.2013 | ||
CY | 06.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.03.2013 | ||
DK | 06.03.2013 | ||
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
HR | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
MC | 06.03.2013 | ||
MT | 06.03.2013 | ||
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
PL | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
IE | 28.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
GB | 06.06.2013 | ||
NO | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
IS | 06.07.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
BE | 06.03.2013 | ||
CY | 06.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.03.2013 | ||
DK | 06.03.2013 | ||
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
HR | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
MC | 06.03.2013 | ||
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
PL | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
IE | 28.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
GB | 06.06.2013 | ||
NO | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
IS | 06.07.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
BE | 06.03.2013 | ||
CY | 06.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.03.2013 | ||
DK | 06.03.2013 | ||
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
HR | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
MC | 06.03.2013 | ||
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
PL | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
IE | 28.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
NO | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
IS | 06.07.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
BE | 06.03.2013 | ||
CY | 06.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.03.2013 | ||
DK | 06.03.2013 | ||
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
HR | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
MC | 06.03.2013 | ||
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
PL | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
NO | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
IS | 06.07.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
BE | 06.03.2013 | ||
CY | 06.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.03.2013 | ||
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
HR | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
MC | 06.03.2013 | ||
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
PL | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
NO | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
IS | 06.07.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
BE | 06.03.2013 | ||
CY | 06.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.03.2013 | ||
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
HR | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
MC | 06.03.2013 | ||
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
PL | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
NO | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
IS | 06.07.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
BE | 06.03.2013 | ||
CY | 06.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.03.2013 | ||
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
HR | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
PL | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
NO | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
IS | 06.07.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
BE | 06.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.03.2013 | ||
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
HR | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
PL | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
NO | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
IS | 06.07.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
BE | 06.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.03.2013 | ||
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
HR | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
NO | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
IS | 06.07.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
BE | 06.03.2013 | ||
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
HR | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
NO | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
IS | 06.07.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
BE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
HR | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
NO | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/44] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
BE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
HR | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
NO | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/41] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
HR | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
NO | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
NO | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
NO | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
NO | 06.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 06.03.2013 | |
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
NO | 06.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 06.03.2013 | |
NO | 06.06.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2003194919 (HSIEH SHAO C [US], et al) [Y] 20 * paragraphs [0019] , [0020] * * figures 3-5B *; | [Y]DE10351540 (INTEDIS GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [Y] 20 * paragraph [0040] * * figures 1-6 *; | [A]US2003171027 (SHUEY JOHN R [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * paragraphs [0025] - [0050] * * figures 1-8 *; | [A]US2007059969 (SHAMOTO WATARU [JP]) [A] 1-19 * paragraphs [0035] - [0051] * * figures 1-18 *; | [A]US6287156 (SWAN JAMES L [US], et al) [A] 20 * column 3, line 29 - column 4, line 19 * * figures 1-5 * |