EP2030669 - Method for manufacturing a hydrogen-permeable membrane and hydrogen-permeable membrane [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/10] | Method and base material for manufacturing a hydrogen-permeable membrane and hydrogen-permeable membrane | ||
[2013/47] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.02.2015 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU, TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sulzer Metco AG Rigackerstrasse 16 5610 Wohlen / CH | [2014/14] |
Former [2009/10] | For all designated states Sulzer Metco AG Rigackerstrasse 16 5610 Wohlen / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Damani, Rajiv J., Dr. Kurlistrasse 46 8404 Winterthur / CH | 02 /
Refke, Arno, Dr. Feldstrasse 18 5507 Mellingen / CH | [2014/14] |
Former [2009/10] | 01 /
Damani, Rajiv J., Dr. Kurlistrasse 46 8404 Winterthur / CH | ||
02 /
Refke, Arno, Dr. Feldstrasse 18 5507 Mellingen / CH | Representative(s) | IPS Irsch AG Langfeldstrasse 88 8500 Frauenfeld / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2014/02] | Intellectual Property Services GmbH Rüegger 9 8595 Altnau / CH | ||
Former [2009/10] | Sulzer Management AG Patentabteilung / 0067 Zürcherstrasse 12 8401 Winterthur / CH | Application number, filing date | 08157152.3 | 29.05.2008 | [2009/10] | Priority number, date | EP20070114428 | 16.08.2007 Original published format: EP 07114428 | [2009/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2030669 | Date: | 04.03.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2030669 | Date: | 02.04.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B01D67/00, B01D53/22, B01D71/02, C04B35/50 | [2013/47] | CPC: |
B01D71/0271 (EP,US);
B01D67/0072 (EP,US);
B01D69/141 (EP,US);
B01D71/0221 (EP,US);
C01B3/503 (EP,US);
C01B3/505 (EP,US);
C04B35/48 (EP,US);
C04B35/50 (EP,US);
B01D2256/16 (EP,US);
B01D2325/20 (EP,US);
B01D2325/26 (EP,US);
C01B2203/0405 (EP,US);
C01B2203/047 (EP,US);
C01B2203/0475 (EP,US);
C01B2203/0485 (EP,US);
C01B2203/0495 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3208 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3213 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3215 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3224 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3225 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3229 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3286 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3289 (EP,US);
C04B2235/768 (EP,US);
Y02P30/00 (EP,US);
Y10T428/131 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31678 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2009/10] | B01D53/22, B01D71/02, C01B3/50 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/10] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Herstellen einer wasserstoffpermeablen Membran sowie wasserstoffpermeable Membran | [2013/47] | English: | Method for manufacturing a hydrogen-permeable membrane and hydrogen-permeable membrane | [2013/47] | French: | Procédé pour la fabrication d'une membrane perméable à l'hydrogène tout comme membrane perméable à l'hydrogène | [2013/47] |
Former [2009/10] | Verfahren und Ausgangsmaterial zum Herstellen einer wasserstoffpermeablen Membran sowie wasserstoffpermeable Membran | ||
Former [2009/10] | Method and base material for manufacturing a hydrogen-permeable membrane and hydrogen-permeable membrane | ||
Former [2009/10] | Procédé et matériau de sortie pour la fabrication d'une membrane perméable à l'hydrogène tout comme membrane perméable à l'hydrogène | Examination procedure | 04.09.2009 | Examination requested [2009/46] | 30.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.05.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 19.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.02.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 20.02.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.09.2009 | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/11] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 19.07.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 19.07.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.08.2010 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.05.2008 | CY | 02.04.2014 | CZ | 02.04.2014 | DK | 02.04.2014 | EE | 02.04.2014 | ES | 02.04.2014 | FI | 02.04.2014 | HR | 02.04.2014 | IT | 02.04.2014 | LT | 02.04.2014 | LV | 02.04.2014 | MC | 02.04.2014 | MT | 02.04.2014 | PL | 02.04.2014 | RO | 02.04.2014 | SE | 02.04.2014 | SI | 02.04.2014 | SK | 02.04.2014 | TR | 02.04.2014 | AT | 29.05.2014 | IE | 29.05.2014 | LU | 29.05.2014 | BE | 31.05.2014 | BG | 02.07.2014 | NO | 02.07.2014 | GR | 03.07.2014 | IS | 02.08.2014 | PT | 04.08.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 29.05.2008 | |
CY | 02.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
IT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
MC | 02.04.2014 | ||
MT | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RO | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
SI | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
AT | 29.05.2014 | ||
IE | 29.05.2014 | ||
BE | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
Former [2016/16] | CY | 02.04.2014 | |
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
IT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
MC | 02.04.2014 | ||
MT | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RO | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
SI | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
AT | 29.05.2014 | ||
IE | 29.05.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/38] | CY | 02.04.2014 | |
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
IT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
MC | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RO | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
SI | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
AT | 29.05.2014 | ||
IE | 29.05.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CY | 02.04.2014 | |
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
IT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
MC | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RO | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
SI | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
IE | 29.05.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | CY | 02.04.2014 | |
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
IT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
MC | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RO | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
IE | 29.05.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | CY | 02.04.2014 | |
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
IT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
MC | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RO | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 02.04.2014 | |
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
MC | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RO | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | CY | 02.04.2014 | |
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
MC | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | CY | 02.04.2014 | |
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
MC | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | CY | 02.04.2014 | |
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | CY | 02.04.2014 | |
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 02.04.2014 | |
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 02.04.2014 | |
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 02.04.2014 | |
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 02.04.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0068139 (BP AMOCO CORP [US]); | [A]US2006275205 (KRIST KEVIN [US], et al) | Examination | EP1338671 | WO03087422 | by applicant | US5853815 | US6235417 | US6569226 | WO03087422 |