EP2012447 - Apparatus for controlling the insertion of additional contents in a multimedia contents stream [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.09.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.09.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.10.2013 [2013/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 3, avenue Octave Gréard 75007 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/08] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 3 avenue Octave Gréard 75007 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2009/02] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54 rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mobasser, Bahman 12 rue de Villeneuve 78310 Maurepas / FR | [2009/02] | Representative(s) | Sciaux, Edmond, et al Alcatel-Lucent International 148/152 route de la Reine 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/10] | Sciaux, Edmond, et al Alcatel-Lucent International 32, avenue Kléber 92700 Colombes / FR | ||
Former [2009/02] | Sciaux, Edmond Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 54 Rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 08157474.1 | 03.06.2008 | [2009/02] | Priority number, date | FR20070055839 | 19.06.2007 Original published format: FR 0755839 | [2009/02] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2012447 | Date: | 07.01.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04H20/10 | [2009/02] | CPC: |
H04H20/103 (EP,US);
H04H60/09 (KR);
H04H20/71 (KR);
H04H60/12 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/02] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Steuern der Einfügung von Zusatzinhalten in einem multimedialen Datenstrom | [2009/02] | English: | Apparatus for controlling the insertion of additional contents in a multimedia contents stream | [2009/02] | French: | Dispositif de gestion d'insertion de contenus complémentaires dans des flux de contenus multimédia | [2009/02] | Examination procedure | 07.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/33] | 30.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/43] | 07.06.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/43] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.07.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2013 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9712486 (BOSTON TECH INC [US]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9749241 (BEN MOSHE GIL [IL], et al) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]US5825407 (COWE ALAN B [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * abstract *; | [AY]WO0150368 (GEODE ELECTRONICS LLC [US], et al) [A] 1,3-9 * the whole document * [Y] 2; | [XY]EP1455294 (DELPHI TECH INC [US]) [X] 1,3-9 * the whole document * [Y] 2; | [A]US6941573 (COWAN THOMAS M [US], et al) [A] 1-9* abstract *; | [A]US2006053442 (RIDDERHEIM STEFAN [SE], et al) [A] 1-9 * abstract * |