EP2055475 - System for cutting continuous covering sheets [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.03.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 05.06.2013 [2013/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Barberan Latorre, Jesús Francisco Avenida 301 n° 112 08860 Castelldefels (Barcelona) / ES | [2009/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2009/19] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/20] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2009/19] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 08157786.8 | 06.06.2008 | [2009/19] | Priority number, date | ES20070002866 | 31.10.2007 Original published format: ES 200702866 | [2009/19] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2055475 | Date: | 06.05.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2055475 | Date: | 16.05.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B32B37/22, B32B38/18 | [2009/19] | CPC: |
B32B38/185 (EP,ES);
B32B37/223 (EP,ES);
B32B2038/047 (EP);
B32B2607/00 (EP);
B32B38/0004 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, IT [2010/02] |
Former [2009/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Schnittsystem für Endlosabdeckfolien | [2009/19] | English: | System for cutting continuous covering sheets | [2009/19] | French: | Système de découpe de feuilles de recouvrement en continu | [2009/19] | Examination procedure | 21.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/46] | 18.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 17.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 27.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.12.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.09.2009 | Opposition(s) | 19.02.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 16.07.2012 | [2013/23] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0314036 (HOECHST AG [DE]); | [X]DE3737946 (ANGER WOLFGANG [AT]); | [X]US5289750 (NAGAFUCHI YASUHIRO [JP], et al); | [X]DE19917828 (DIEFFENBACHER GMBH MASCHF [DE]); | [X]DE10123521 (FRIZ KASCHIERTECHNIK GMBH [DE]); | [A]DE10328868 (TP MASCHINENTECHNIK [DE]) | by applicant | US5289750 | EP1688250 |