EP2131025 - Intake channels for internal combustion engines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.10.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.11.2014 [2014/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2009/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fritz, Jassin Schweidnitzerstr 25 80997 Munich / DE | 02 /
Rodriguez Erdmenger, Rodrigo Freisinger Landstrasse 50 85748 Garching / DE | [2009/50] | Representative(s) | Bedford, Grant Richard GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/50] | Bedford, Grant Richard GE London Patent Operation 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 08157801.5 | 06.06.2008 | [2009/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2131025 | Date: | 09.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F02B31/08, F02F1/42 | [2009/50] | CPC: |
F02B31/085 (EP,US);
F02B31/082 (US);
F02B31/042 (EP);
F02F1/4214 (EP,US);
F02F1/4235 (EP,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/50] | Title | German: | Einlasskanäle für Verbrennungsmotoren | [2009/50] | English: | Intake channels for internal combustion engines | [2009/50] | French: | Canaux d'entrée pour moteurs à combustion interne | [2009/50] | Examination procedure | 09.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/29] | 12.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.02.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.08.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/46] | 07.07.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/46] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.07.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2014 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2035939 (KLOECKNER HUMBOLDT DEUTZ AG [DE]); | [X]US4207854 (ALFORD RICHARD R [US], et al); | [X]US4465034 (TSUTSUMI SABURO [JP]); | [X]JPS61104119 (NISSAN MOTOR); | [X]US5704324 (ICHINOSE HIROKI [JP], et al); | [X]FR2879673 (RENAULT SAS [FR]) | Examination | US5671712 | DE10323978 | by applicant | US4432312 | EP0235288 | US4699104 | US4745890 | US4909210 | US5435283 | US2002124829 | US2004244767 |