EP2136121 - Pressed fitting for a pipe, in particular plastic pipe or plastic-metal composite pipe [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.10.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Uponor Innovation AB P.O. Box 101 73061 Virsbo / SE | [2013/04] |
Former [2009/52] | For all designated states Uponor Innovation AB Industrivägen 513 81 Fristad / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Galle, Roland Ilmenbergstrasse 13 97422 Schweinfurt / DE | 02 /
Geier, Rudolf Rosenweg 6 97633 Sulzfeld / DE | [2009/52] | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schloßschmidstraße 5 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Ridlerstrasse 55 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08157862.7 | 09.06.2008 | [2009/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2136121 | Date: | 23.12.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F16L33/207 | [2009/52] | CPC: |
F16L33/2078 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/52] | Title | German: | Pressfitting für ein Rohr, insbesondere Kunststoffrohr oder Kunststoff/Metallverbund-Rohr | [2009/52] | English: | Pressed fitting for a pipe, in particular plastic pipe or plastic-metal composite pipe | [2009/52] | French: | Pressfitting pour un tuyau, en particulier un tuyau en plastique ou un tuyau en alliage de plastique et de métal | [2009/52] | Examination procedure | 18.06.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/30] | 02.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/47] | 18.07.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/47] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.01.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO03064912 (GEBERIT TECHNIK AG [CH], et al) [X] 1,3-5 * page 3, line 31 - page 5, line 25; figure 1 *[A] 2,6; | [X]WO2008009573 (VETEC GMBH VERBINDUNGSTECHNOLO [DE], et al) [X] 1-6 * page 11, line 14 - page 17, line 9; figure - * | Examination | DE10347705 | DE102004047886 | EP1653142 | by applicant | WO03064912 | WO2008009573 |