Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP2136121
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
19.10.2018 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] |
17.07.2018 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
30.06.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.02.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
03.11.2017 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
18.08.2017 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
30.06.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.05.2017 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
04.01.2017 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
23.12.2016 |
First examination report |
|
01.07.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.06.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.04.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.06.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.12.2012 |
Change - applicant |
published on 23.01.2013 [2013/04] |
08.04.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.06.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.07.2010 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 01.09.2010 [2010/35] |
25.06.2010 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
25.06.2010 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 28.07.2010 [2010/30] |
13.04.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.11.2009 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 23.12.2009 [2009/52] |
23.10.2009 |
Change - representative |
published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] |