EP1962292 - Constant slope ramp circuits for sample-data circuits [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.02.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.04.2014 [2014/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cambridge Analog Technologies, Inc. 54 Middlesex Turnpike, Suite 1250 Bedford, MA 01730 / US | [2013/17] |
Former [2008/35] | For all designated states Cambridge Analog Technologies, Inc. 54 Middlesex Turnpike, Suite 1250 Bedford, MA 01730 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Hae-seung 63 Notre Dame Road Bedford, MA 01730 / US | [2008/46] |
Former [2008/35] | 01 /
Lee, Hae-seung 63 Notre Dame road Bedford, MA 01730 / US | Representative(s) | Bergmeier, Werner, et al Canzler & Bergmeier Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Friedrich-Ebert-Straße 84 85055 Ingolstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/43] | Bergmeier, Werner, et al Canzler & Bergmeier Friedrich-Ebert-Straße 84 85055 Ingolstadt / DE | ||
Former [2008/35] | Valea AB Lindholmspiren 5 417 56 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 08158094.6 | 18.07.2006 | [2008/35] | Priority number, date | US20050595605P | 19.07.2005 Original published format: US 595605 P | US20050595623P | 21.07.2005 Original published format: US 595623 P | US20060454275 | 16.06.2006 Original published format: US 454275 | [2008/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1962292 | Date: | 27.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1962292 | Date: | 27.01.2010 | [2010/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1962292 | Date: | 24.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G11C27/02, H03K17/13, H04L27/156 | [2010/04] | CPC: |
G11C27/026 (EP);
G11C27/024 (EP);
H03K5/1536 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2008/35] | G11C27/02, G01R19/175, H03K5/1536 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2010/39] |
Former [2008/35] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Schaltkreise mit konstanter Steigungsrampe für Probendatenschaltkreise | [2008/35] | English: | Constant slope ramp circuits for sample-data circuits | [2008/35] | French: | Circuits de rampe à pente constante pour circuits de données d'échantillon | [2008/35] | Examination procedure | 20.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/35] | 28.07.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 17.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.09.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 20.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 12.03.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06800132.0 / EP1911161 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060800132) is 04.06.2008 | Opposition(s) | 27.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4800333 (MILKOVIC MIRAN [US]) [A] 1-36 * column 8, line 19 - column 9, line 7; figure 2 *; | [A]WO9305598 (CODEX CORP [US]) [A] 1-36* page 8, line 24 - page 10, line 23; figure 4a *; | [A]US6556072 (NICOLLINI GERMANO [IT], et al) [A] 1-36 * column 6, line 4 - line 39; figure 6 * | by applicant | US4800333 |